Chambers v. Maplebear, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph Chambers
Defendant: Maplebear, Inc. doing business as Instacart
Case Number: 1:2021cv07114
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #16 MOTION for Tara Boghosian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25211017. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): expired Certificate of Good Standing from Massachusetts; Affidavit is not notarized. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
October 18, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Tara Boghosian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25211017. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Joseph Chambers. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Tara Boghosian in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Boghosian, Tara)
October 15, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Pre-Motion Conference held on 10/15/2021. Plaintiff's and Defendants' counsel present. Defendants are granted leave to file a motion to compel arbitration with the following briefing schedule: moving papers due November 5, 2021; responses due November 29, 2021; and reply due December 6, 2021. (jar)
October 14, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin Raphael on behalf of Maplebear, Inc...(Raphael, Justin)
October 12, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew M. Spurchise on behalf of Maplebear, Inc...(Spurchise, Andrew)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Conference re: #9 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Rohit K. Singla dated 09/15/2021. A pre-motion conference will be held on October 15, 2021 at 04:30 PM by telephone. The parties are instructed to call (877) 411-9748 and enter access code 3029857#. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Juliana Yee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
September 20, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Shannon Liss-Riordan dated September 20, 2021 re: Plaintiff's response to September 15, 2021 letter from Defendant Maplebear, Inc.. Document filed by Joseph Chambers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
September 17, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Juliana Yee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25072621. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 16, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Juliana Yee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25072621. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Maplebear, Inc...(Yee, Juliana)
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Rohit K. Singla dated 09/15/2021. Document filed by Maplebear, Inc...(Singla, Rohit)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Rohit K. Singla dated 09/09/2021. The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/10/2021) (cf)
September 9, 2021 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Maplebear, Inc...(Singla, Rohit)
September 9, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Rohit K. Singla dated 09/09/2021. Document filed by Maplebear, Inc...(Singla, Rohit)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Maplebear, Inc. served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. Service was accepted by Jeff "Doe", Cogency Global Inc., Registered Agent. Document filed by Joseph Chambers..(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maplebear, Inc...(jgo)
August 24, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Shannon Liss-Riordan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 4 (Diversity);. (jgo)
August 24, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 24, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 24, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Maplebear, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Chambers..(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Maplebear, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24972192)Document filed by Joseph Chambers..(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. Maplebear, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Chambers
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Tara Boghosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maplebear, Inc. doing business as Instacart
Represented By: Rohit K. Singla
Represented By: Andrew M. Spurchise
Represented By: Juliana Yee
Represented By: Justin Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?