Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. RNW Electric Corp.
Petitioner: Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds, Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York and New York City District Council of Carpenters
Respondent: RNW Electric Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv07173
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order issued by Judge Alison J. Nathan on September 16, 2021 and the Individual Rules of Judge Alison J. Nathan served on RNW Electric Corp. on September 17, 2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds..(Marimon, Nicole)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, November 12, 2021 at 3:00 pm. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED parties are to submit their Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Joint Letter, as directed below, no later than Wednesday, November 3, 2021. Unless the Court states otherwise, the Court will not hold the upcoming initial pretrial conference in this case in person. The conference will proceed by telephone. The parties and members of the public may access the conference by dialing (888) 363-4749 and entering access code 9196964. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 11/12/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/14/2021) (ama)
September 1, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,, served. RNW Electric Corp. served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, an authorized person in the corporation division of the department of state. Document filed by Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund ; New York City District Council of Carpenters; Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds..(Marimon, Nicole)
August 27, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to RNW Electric Corp.. (sj)
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to RNW Electric Corp., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,,. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds..(Marimon, Nicole)
August 26, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Nicole Marimon to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name on the PDF 'To' section does not match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
August 26, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 26, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 26, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,, . Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds..(Marimon, Nicole)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds..(Marimon, Nicole)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to RNW Electrical Corp., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,,. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds..(Marimon, Nicole) Modified on 8/26/2021 (jgo).
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Marimon, Nicole)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24981207).Document filed by Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A- PLA Letter of Assent- Croton Park, #2 Ex. B-NYC Agency- 2015-18 New Construction PLA - Agency Solicitation Version - 2015 10 16, #3 Ex. C-NYC Agency -2020_New_Construction_PLA_Agency_Solicitation_Version, #4 Ex. D-H Independent Heavy Construction 11-17, #5 Ex. E-January 2016 Revised Collection Policy, #6 Ex. F-March 1, 2021 Notice of Hearing, #7 Ex. G-May 22, 2021 Arbitration Award, #8 Ex. H- History Bill for the Court, #9 Ex. I- Proposed Judgment).(Marimon, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. RNW Electric Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: New York City District Council of Carpenters
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RNW Electric Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?