Diatek Licensing LLC v. VIMEO.COM, Inc.
Plaintiff: Diatek Licensing LLC
Defendant: VIMEO.COM, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv07249
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Filing 13 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE TERMINATED - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 9/1/2021 in a court action filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).(dt)
September 7, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John P. Cronan. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
September 7, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-06457-JPC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
September 7, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: The Court notes that it will hold IPTCs for related cases from 3:00 to 4:30 p.m. which counsel may attend if interested. Unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will conduct all IPTCs by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/27/2021 at 03:30 PM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 9/2/2021) (jca)
September 1, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) VIMEO.COM, Inc.. Document filed by Diatek Licensing LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Alexander, Cortney)
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. VIMEO.COM, Inc. served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, The Corporation Trust Company, Registered Agent. Document filed by Diatek Licensing LLC..(Alexander, Cortney)
August 30, 2021 Filing 9 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(jgo)
August 30, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to VIMEO.COM, Inc...(jgo)
August 30, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge John P. Cronan as possibly related to 21-cv-6457. (jgo)
August 30, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 30, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Cortney Scott Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24993855. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 30, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
August 27, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Cortney Scott Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24993855. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Diatek Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Cortney S. Alexander, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Alexander, Cortney)
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Diatek Licensing LLC..(Alexander, Cortney)
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-06457. Document filed by Diatek Licensing LLC..(Alexander, Cortney)
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to VIMEO.COM, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Diatek Licensing LLC..(Alexander, Cortney)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Alexander, Cortney)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Alexander, Cortney)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against VIMEO.COM, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24993792)Document filed by Diatek Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 7,079,752, #2 Exhibit B - US Patent No. 8,195,828, #3 Exhibit C - Claim Chart for the '752 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - Claim Chart for the '828 Patent).(Alexander, Cortney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diatek Licensing LLC v. VIMEO.COM, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diatek Licensing LLC
Represented By: Cortney Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIMEO.COM, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?