Jones v. Nissan Motor Acceptance Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brittany Jones
Defendant: Nissan Motor Acceptance Company LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC, TransUnion LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv07298
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Chan, Melanie)
October 28, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Settlement As to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Document filed by Brittany Jones..(Cesar, Alain)
October 20, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Settlement As to Equifax Information Services, LLC. Document filed by Brittany Jones..(Cesar, Alain)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on November 9, 2021, at 12:00 p.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. Initial Conference set for 11/9/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 9/28/2021) (va) Modified on 9/30/2021 (va).
September 28, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Settlement As to Equifax Information Services, LLC. Document filed by Brittany Jones..(Cesar, Alain)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #27 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Equifax Information Services LLC requesting Extension of Time to File Answer w/ Plaintiff's Counsel's Consent dated Sep. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 10/29/2021 (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
September 23, 2021 Filing 27 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Equifax Information Services LLC requesting Extension of Time to File Answer w/ Plaintiff's Counsel's Consent dated September 23, 2021. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Brownstein, Boris)
September 23, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Boris Brownstein on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC..(Brownstein, Boris)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
September 23, 2021 Filing 24 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Melanie K. Chan dated 9/23/2021. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Chan, Melanie)
September 22, 2021 Filing 23 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Chan, Melanie)
September 22, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melanie Karen Chan on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Chan, Melanie)
September 22, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by TransUnion LLC..(Nicodemus, Camille)
September 20, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nissan Motor Acceptance Company LLC..(Sateary, Thomas J)
September 20, 2021 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nissan North America, Inc. for Nissan Motor Acceptance Company LLC. Document filed by Nissan Motor Acceptance Company LLC..(Sateary, Thomas J)
September 20, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas J J. Sateary on behalf of Nissan Motor Acceptance Company LLC..(Sateary, Thomas J)
September 14, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. Service was accepted by Christopher Boyd; Intake Specialist. Document filed by Brittany Jones..(Cesar, Alain)
September 9, 2021 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for TransUnion LLC. Document filed by TransUnion LLC..(Nicodemus, Camille)
September 9, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Camille Renee Nicodemus on behalf of TransUnion LLC..(Nicodemus, Camille)
September 7, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Nissan Motor Acceptance Company LLC served on 9/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021. Service was accepted by John Doe, Legal Representative of CSC. Document filed by Brittany Jones..(Cesar, Alain)
September 7, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. TransUnion LLC served on 9/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021. Service was accepted by John Doe, Legal Representative of CSC. Document filed by Brittany Jones..(Cesar, Alain)
September 7, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 9/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021. Service was accepted by John Doe, Legal Representative of CSC. Document filed by Brittany Jones..(Cesar, Alain)
September 1, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(gp)
September 1, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TransUnion LLC..(gp)
September 1, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nissan Motor Acceptance Company LLC..(gp)
September 1, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Equifax Information Services, LLC..(gp)
September 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
September 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
September 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig B. Sanders on behalf of Brittany Jones..(Sanders, Craig)
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Brittany Jones..(Cesar, Alain)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TransUnion LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Brittany Jones..(Cesar, Alain)
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Brittany Jones..(Cesar, Alain)
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nissan Motor Acceptance Company LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Brittany Jones..(Cesar, Alain)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cesar, Alain)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Nissan Motor Acceptance Company LLC, TransUnion LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25001104)Document filed by Brittany Jones..(Cesar, Alain)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Nissan Motor Acceptance Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Jones
Represented By: Craig B. Sanders
Represented By: Alain Cesar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Acceptance Company LLC
Represented By: Thomas J J. Sateary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Boris Brownstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion LLC
Represented By: Camille Renee Nicodemus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Boris Brownstein
Represented By: Melanie Karen Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?