Simmons v. Rodenas
Plaintiff: Selina Simmons
Defendant: Jennifer Rodenas
Case Number: 1:2021cv07305
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 mv
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION CAPPING DAMAGES AND REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT: IT IS HEREBY FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that in exchange for the above, Defendant agrees to remand this case to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, Bronx County. Having considered the Stipulation between the Parties, and good cause appearing, this Court hereby ORDERS that the Action be remanded to Supreme Court of the State of New York, Bronx County. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/25/2021) (jca) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 25, 2021 CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1Z E22 E53 37 1005 394 2 on 10/25/2021. (jca)
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Selina Simmons..(Levy, Brian)
October 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Jarrod Levy on behalf of Selina Simmons..(Levy, Brian)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: Unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will conduct the IPTC by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. Initial Conference set for 11/16/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 9/8/2021) (tg)
September 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
September 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
September 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Susan G Duncan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Selina Simmons and Jennifer Rodenas. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (gp)
September 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Susan G Duncan. The following case opening statistical information was omitted: Other Court Name Bronx Supreme Court; the Other Court Number 806554/2021E. (gp)
September 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Duncan, Susan)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 806554/2021E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25002671).Document filed by Jennifer Rodenas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit state summons and complaint, #2 Exhibit verified answer, #3 Exhibit supplemental demand for discovery, #4 Exhibit pltfs bill of particulars, #5 Exhibit jury demand).(Duncan, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Rodenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selina Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Rodenas
Represented By: Susan G Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?