Rodenburg v. Chrismatic Studios Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Patsy Rodenburg
Defendant: cHRISMATIC sTUDIOS cORP, Michael Howard Studios, Gabrielle Berberich and Chrismatic Studios Corp. doing business as Michael Howard Studios
Case Number: 1:2021cv07308
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 ds
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Robert A. Giacovas in Support re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Gabrielle Berberich, Chrismatic Studios Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint).(Giacovas, Robert)
October 29, 2021 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Gabrielle Berberich, Chrismatic Studios Corp...(Giacovas, Robert)
October 29, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Gabrielle Berberich, Chrismatic Studios Corp...(Giacovas, Robert)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 30 days date of this Order. This case is to be tried to a jury. Deposition due by 3/11/2022. Fact Discovery due by 1/27/2022. Expert Discovery due by 3/11/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2022 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/21/2021) (tg)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #19 Letter, filed by Patsy Rodenburg. ENDORSEMENT: The initial pretrial conference scheduled for October 29, 2021 is CANCELED. A case management plan will be entered separately. Upon a joint request, the Court is happy to refer the parties to Magistrate Judge Moses for a settlement conference prior to the end of fact discovery. If Defendants file a motion to dismiss, Plaintiff may either oppose Defendants' motion to dismiss or amend her complaint as of right, but she may not do both. Discovery as to information uniquely relevant to Plaintiff's defamation claim is STAYED pending the Court's resolution of Defendants' motion to dismiss, if any. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/22/2021) (tg)
October 21, 2021 Filing 19 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Scott A. Birnbaum, William J. Grace and Robert A. Giacovas dated October 21, 2021 re: Proposed Case Management Plan. Document filed by Patsy Rodenburg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Case Management Plan).(Birnbaum, Scott)
September 16, 2021 Filing 18 COMPLAINT against Gabrielle Berberich, Chrismatic Studios Corp.. Document filed by Patsy Rodenburg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Kruzer, James)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #15 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Robert A. Giacovas dated September 14, 2021.JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Initially Scheduled for October 29 addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Robert A. Giacovas dated September 14, 2021., #4 Complaint. Gabrielle Berberich answer due 10/29/2021; Chrismatic Studios Corp. answer due 10/29/2021; denying #15 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint is adjourned to October 29, 2021. The initial pretrial conference will take place on October 29, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. as originally scheduled. The parties' joint submission is due by October 21, 2021. The parties should appear for the conference by dialing 888-363-4749, using the access code 3121171 and the security code 7308. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/14/2021) (kv)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/14/2021) (kv)
September 14, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Robert A. Giacovas dated September 14, 2021., JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Initially Scheduled for October 29 addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Robert A. Giacovas dated September 14, 2021. Document filed by Gabrielle Berberich, Chrismatic Studios Corp...(Giacovas, Robert)
September 14, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacob Ari Englander on behalf of Gabrielle Berberich, Chrismatic Studios Corp...(Englander, Jacob)
September 14, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Anthony Giacovas on behalf of Gabrielle Berberich, Chrismatic Studios Corp...(Giacovas, Robert)
September 14, 2021 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit to Complaint (Assented) addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from James E. Kruzer dated September 14, 2021. Document filed by Patsy Rodenburg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint).(Kruzer, James)
September 14, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James E Kruzer on behalf of Patsy Rodenburg..(Kruzer, James)
September 14, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott A Birnbaum on behalf of Patsy Rodenburg..(Birnbaum, Scott)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #8 Motion for Scott A. Birnbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys.. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/13/2021) (kv)
September 13, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Scott A. Birnbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 10, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Scott A. Birnbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Patsy Rodenburg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Birnbaum, Scott)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #6 Motion for James E. Kruzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/09/2021) (ama)
September 9, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #5 MOTION for Scott A. Birnbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25030764. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney Affidavit mislabeled as a motion and also not notarized per local rule 1.3;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
September 9, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for James E. Kruzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25032737. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for James E. Kruzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25032737. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Patsy Rodenburg. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit James E. Kruzer Declaration in support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 James E. Kruzer Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order James E. Kruzer Proposed Order).(Birnbaum, Scott)
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Scott A. Birnbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25030764. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Patsy Rodenburg. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Scott Birnbaum, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Birnbaum, Scott) Modified on 9/9/2021 (bcu).
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Gabrielle Berberich, Chrismatic Studios Corp.. Document filed by Patsy Rodenburg..(Grace, Michael)
September 2, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Grace, Michael)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: In light of the COVID-19 situation, the Court will conduct the Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on October 29, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888-363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 7308. Counsel should submit their proposed case management plan and joint letter as outlined below. This Court encourages plaintiffs to serve defendants promptly. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/29/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/02/2021) (ama)
September 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Michael John Grace. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Michael Howard Studios. The party was added to the case in error. (vf)
September 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael John Grace. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Gabrielle Berberich, Michael Howard Studios, cHRISMATIC sTUDIOS cORP, Patsy Rodenburg. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; alias party name was omitted. (vf)
September 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Michael John Grace. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
September 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael John Grace to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error; Signature of the ECF Filing Attorney User not provided. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
September 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
September 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
September 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Gabrielle Berberich, Chrismatic Studios Corp. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25003520)Document filed by Patsy Rodenburg.(Grace, Michael) Modified on 9/1/2021 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodenburg v. Chrismatic Studios Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy Rodenburg
Represented By: Michael John Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cHRISMATIC sTUDIOS cORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Howard Studios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabrielle Berberich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrismatic Studios Corp. doing business as Michael Howard Studios
Represented By: Robert Anthony Giacovas
Represented By: Jacob Ari Englander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?