CopyWatch, Inc. v. Unisys Corporation
Plaintiff: COPYWATCH, INC.
Defendant: Unisys Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv07386
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION TO ADJOURN THE TIME FOR UNISYS CORPORATION TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, as represented by the undersigned counsel, that Defendant Unisys Corporation's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff CopyWatch, Inc.'s Complaint shall be adjourned until and including November 24, 2021. In accordance with Rule 1(D) of Your Honors Individual Practices in Civil Cases: (1) the deadline sought to be extended is the October 25, 2021 deadline for Defendant Unisys Corporation to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff CopyWatch, Inc.'s Complaint; (2) the length of time requested for the extension is thirty days; (3) this is Defendant Unisys Corporation's first request for an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff CopyWatch, Inc.'s Complaint; (4) the reason for the request is for Defendant Unisys Corporation to have additional time to investigate the allegations in the Complaint in order to properly respond; and (5) Counsel for Plaintiff CopyWatch, Inc. consents to the adjournment. Accordingly, the parties respectfully request that the Stipulation be. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/22/2021) Unisys Corporation answer due 11/24/2021. (ks)
October 21, 2021 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Unisys Corporation. Document filed by Unisys Corporation..(Hutchinson, Jenna)
October 21, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jenna Christine Hutchinson on behalf of Unisys Corporation..(Hutchinson, Jenna)
October 21, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by CopyWatch, Inc...(Pontone, Michael)
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Unisys Corporation served on 10/4/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. Service was accepted by Jane Doe, CSC, authorized clerk. Document filed by CopyWatch, Inc...(Pontone, Michael)
September 8, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Unisys Corporation. (vf)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Unisys Corporation, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by CopyWatch, Inc...(Pontone, Michael)
September 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to dial 888-363-4749 to participate, and to enter the access code 6212642. The press and public may obtain access to the telephone conference by dialing the same number and using the same access code. The Court is holding multiple telephone conferences on this date. The parties should call in at the scheduled time and wait on the line for their case to be called. At that time, the Court will un-mute the parties lines. Initial Conference set for 1/6/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/4/2021) (tg)
September 3, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Unisys Corporation. Document filed by CopyWatch, Inc...(Pontone, Michael)
September 3, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pontone, Michael)
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Unisys Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by CopyWatch, Inc...(Pontone, Michael) Modified on 9/3/2021 (pc).
September 3, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 3, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael J.S. Pontone. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 150 (Contract: Recovery/Enforcement); Dollar Demand blank; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 190 (Contract: Other); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $4,500,000; the County code has been modified to Sullivan;. (pc)
September 3, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael J.S. Pontone to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. Summons form;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
September 3, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Michael J.S. Pontone. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
September 3, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael J.S. Pontone. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: COPYWATCH, INC., Unisys Corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
September 3, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael J.S. Pontone to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; The complaint must be the main document of the filing. Remove the summons form. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 9/8/2021. (pc)
September 3, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael J.S. Pontone. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $4,500,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank;. (pc)
September 3, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
September 3, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael J.S. Pontone to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Link the summons to the correctly filed complaint (document 4);. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
September 3, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unisys Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25014888)Document filed by COPYWATCH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Contract Agreement, #2 Exhibit Report Spreadsheet 1, #3 Exhibit Report Spreadsheet 2, #4 Exhibit Report Spreadsheet 3).(Pontone, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CopyWatch, Inc. v. Unisys Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COPYWATCH, INC.
Represented By: Michael J.S. Pontone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unisys Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?