Qaeyd et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Yahya N Qaeyd and N H Deli & Grocery Corp.
Defendant: United States of America, United States Department of Agriculture and United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service
Case Number: 1:2021cv07481
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 202
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT: IT IS STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Parties, through their respective counsel, as follows: 1. This action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs, expenses, or attorney's fees. (As further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/15/2021) (va)
October 14, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America..(Stein, Ilan)
October 4, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ilan Stein on behalf of United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America..(Stein, Ilan)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, by December 3, 2021, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: 1. A brief description of the nature of the action and the principal defenses thereto; 2. A brief explanation of why jurisdiction and venue lie in this Court. If any party is a corporation, the letter shall state both the place of incorporation and the principal place of business. If any party is a partnership, limited partnership, limited liability company or trust, the letter shall state the citizenship of each of the entitys members, shareholders, partners and/or trustees; 3. A brief description of all contemplated and/or outstanding motions, and a proposed briefing schedule; 4. A brief description of prior settlement discussions (without disclosing the parties offers or settlement positions) and the prospect of settlement; 5. Any other information that the parties believe may assist the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial status conference on December 10, 2021 at 2:45 p.m. This conference will be held via telephone. The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. Plaintiff is ordered to serve Defendants with a copy of this order and to file an affidavit on ECF certifying that such service has been effectuated. Initial Conference set for 12/10/2021 at 02:45 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/14/2021) (ate)
September 9, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America..(pc)
September 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jess Martin Berkowitz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code blank; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 07:2023(a); the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
September 9, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
September 9, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jess Martin Berkowitz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: United States Department of Agriculture. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
September 9, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
September 9, 2021 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #4 Complaint,. Filing fee $ 402.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-25029404, paid on 09/07/2021..(pc)
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Berkowitz, Jess)
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by N H Deli & Grocery Corp., Yahya N Qaeyd..(Berkowitz, Jess)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America. Document filed by Yahya N Qaeyd, N H Deli & Grocery Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Amended Declaration of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit FNS letter 11/27/2018, #3 Exhibit Transaction Reports, #4 Exhibit Attorney letter 2/15/2021, #5 Exhibit Final Agency Decision).(Berkowitz, Jess)
September 8, 2021 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 2 Request for Issuance of Summons for EDNY. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (jgo)
September 8, 2021 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 1 Complaint for EDNY. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (jgo)
September 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jess Martin Berkowitz to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 9/13/2021. (jgo)
September 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jess Martin Berkowitz to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
September 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jess Martin Berkowitz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code Foley Square Suspense;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to Foley Square;. (jgo)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25029404)Document filed by Yahya N Qaeyd, N H Deli & Grocery Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit FNS letter 11/27/2018, #3 Exhibit Transaction Reports, #4 Exhibit Attorney letter 2/15/2021, #5 Exhibit Final Agency Decision).(Berkowitz, Jess)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Qaeyd et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yahya N Qaeyd
Represented By: Jess Martin Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N H Deli & Grocery Corp.
Represented By: Jess Martin Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Ilan Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service
Represented By: Ilan Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?