BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc. v. Keurig Green Mountain, Inc.
Plaintiff: BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc.
Defendant: Keurig Green Mountain Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv07493
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Filing 12 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New York Eastern; Case Number: 1:21-cv-04288. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
September 8, 2021 Filing 11 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-3: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of New York for the reasons stated in the order of June 3, 2014, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Vernon S. Broderick. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/8/2021.]
September 8, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:14-md-02542-VSB-SLC. (sjo)
September 8, 2021 Case transferred to District of southern District of New York. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/8/2021.]
September 8, 2021 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:14-md-02542-VSB-SLC. (sjo)
September 8, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
September 8, 2021 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
September 8, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
September 8, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion to Stay. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 8/17/2021. (Kuntz, William) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/8/2021.]
August 16, 2021 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Keurig Green Mountain, Inc.. (Mukhi, Rahul) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/8/2021.]
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keurig Green Mountain, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Keurig Dr Pepper Inc. for Keurig Green Mountain, Inc.. (Mukhi, Rahul) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/8/2021.]
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rahul Mukhi on behalf of Keurig Green Mountain, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Mukhi, Rahul) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/8/2021.]
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc.. Keurig Green Mountain, Inc. served on 8/5/2021, answer due 8/26/2021. (Iovieno, Philip) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/8/2021.]
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephone Initial Conference will be held in this case on November 2, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge. All counsel are required to attend. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. (The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office.)Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. By October 28, 2021, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that Defendant is aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 8/3/2021. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/8/2021.]
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/8/2021.]
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/8/2021.]
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Keurig Green Mountain, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/8/2021.]
July 30, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/8/2021.]
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/8/2021.]
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Keurig Green Mountain, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14708763 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Iovieno, Philip) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/8/2021.]
July 30, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit a completed 2 Page Form (Not the Instruction Page)Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/8/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc. v. Keurig Green Mountain, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc.
Represented By: Philip J. Iovieno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keurig Green Mountain Inc.
Represented By: Rahul Mukhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?