Enchante Accessories, Inc. v. Helen of Troy Ltd.
Plaintiff: Enchante Accessories, Inc.
Defendant: Helen of Troy Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2021cv07548
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 tr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Enchante Accessories, Inc.. Document filed by Helen of Troy Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Reg. No. 1,652,173, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Reg. No. 1,876,359, #3 Exhibit C - U.S. Reg. No. 1,917,087, #4 Exhibit D - U.S. Reg. No. 2,235,105, #5 Exhibit E - U.S. Reg. No. 2,421,766, #6 Exhibit F - U.S. Reg. No. 2,815,318, #7 Exhibit G - U.S. Reg. No. 2,851,481, #8 Exhibit H - U.S. Reg. No. 3,362,181, #9 Exhibit I - U.S. Reg. No. 3,796,113, #10 Exhibit J - U.S. Reg. No. 5,742,475, #11 Exhibit K - U.S. Patent No. 7,832,027, #12 Exhibit L - U.S. Patent No. 8,117,685, #13 Exhibit M - U.S. Patent No. 8,171,574).(Moffett, Daniel)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Laura E. Kogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc)
November 2, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #25 MOTION for Laura E. Kogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25269191. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 1, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Laura E. Kogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25269191. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Enchante Accessories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Laura Kogan Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Laura Kogan Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission PHV, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order Granting Laura Kogan Motion for Admission PHV).(Kogan, Laura)
October 20, 2021 Filing 24 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Helen of Troy Limited (Bermuda) for Helen of Troy Ltd.. Document filed by Helen of Troy Ltd...(Moffett, Daniel)
October 18, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Edward C. Wipper on behalf of Enchante Accessories, Inc.. New Address: Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff, 17 State Street, Suite 4000, New York, NY, United States 10004, 646-593-7050..(Wipper, Edward)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Hannah D. Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc)
October 12, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 MOTION for Hannah D. Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 11, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Hannah D. Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Helen of Troy Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hannah Price, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Price, Hannah)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Daniel L. Moffett to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc)
October 8, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Rachel Gibson on behalf of Helen of Troy Ltd...(Gibson, Melissa)
October 8, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #18 MOTION for Hannah D. Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25167771. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas; Supreme Court of Louisiana. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
October 8, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for Daniel L. Moffett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25167499. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
October 7, 2021 Filing 18 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Hannah D. Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25167771. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Helen of Troy Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Hannah Price, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Price, Hannah) Modified on 10/8/2021 (aea).
October 7, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Daniel L. Moffett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25167499. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Helen of Troy Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel L. Moffett, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Moffett, Daniel)
September 22, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Distribution re: #15 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference,. Document filed by Enchante Accessories, Inc...(Klaiber, James)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference by telephone set for 11/19/2021 at 02:45 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. The parties shall use the dial-in information provided below to call into the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/20/2021) (vfr)
September 20, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Enchante Accessories, Inc. waiver sent on 9/13/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. Document filed by Enchante Accessories, Inc...(Polka, Michael)
September 14, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Helen of Troy Ltd.. (sj)
September 14, 2021 Filing 12 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(sj)
September 14, 2021 Filing 11 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(sj)
September 13, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Helen of Troy Ltd c/o Trident Corporate Services (Barbados) Ltd, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Enchante Accessories, Inc...(Polka, Michael)
September 13, 2021 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Polka, Michael)
September 10, 2021 Filing 8 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Klaiber, James)
September 10, 2021 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Klaiber, James)
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael M Polka on behalf of Enchante Accessories, Inc...(Polka, Michael)
September 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Robert Klaiber on behalf of Enchante Accessories, Inc...(Klaiber, James)
September 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Edward C. Wipper to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the incorrect Basis of Jurisdiction code was selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
September 10, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Edward C. Wipper. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo)
September 10, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 10, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wipper, Edward) Modified on 9/10/2021 (jgo).
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Enchante Accessories, Inc...(Wipper, Edward)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wipper, Edward) Modified on 9/10/2021 (jgo).
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Helen of Troy Ltd.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25040150)Document filed by Enchante Accessories, Inc...(Wipper, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enchante Accessories, Inc. v. Helen of Troy Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enchante Accessories, Inc.
Represented By: Edward C. Wipper
Represented By: James Robert Klaiber
Represented By: Laura Kogan
Represented By: Michael M Polka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen of Troy Ltd.
Represented By: Daniel L. Moffett
Represented By: Hannah D. Price
Represented By: Melissa Rachel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?