Herrera et al v. New York City Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: LOIS HERRERA, Jaye Murray and Laura Feijoo
Defendant: NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION and Richard Carranza
Case Number: 1:2021cv07555
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 11/15/2021. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/15) (jpt)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bilal Husain Haider on behalf of Richard Carranza, New York City Department of Education..(Haider, Bilal)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Richard Carranza, New York City Department of Education..(Profeta, Lawrence)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court directs counsel for all parties to appear at an Initial Pretrial Conference on November 19, 2021, at 12:00 PM. The conference will be held telephonically. To join the conference, dial 888-278-0296 and enter access code 5195844. Initial Conference set for 11/19/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 10/8/2021) (tg)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Profeta, Lawrence)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Adam Heller on behalf of Laura Feijoo, Lois Herrera, Jaye Murray..(Heller, Brian)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Lawrence John Profeta to Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet, the civil cover sheet is filed as a separate event not as an attachment. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lawrence John Profeta. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Richard Carranza. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lawrence John Profeta. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court); the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Laura Feijoo, Lois Herrera, Jaye Murray.(Perry, Davida)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Davida S. Perry on behalf of Laura Feijoo, Lois Herrera, Jaye Murray..(Perry, Davida)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 155316/2019. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25044158).Document filed by New York City Department of Education, Richard Carranza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit).(Profeta, Lawrence)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Lawrence John Profeta. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Lawrence John Profeta to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 9/15/2021. (vf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrera et al v. New York City Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOIS HERRERA
Represented By: Davida S. Perry
Represented By: Brian Adam Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaye Murray
Represented By: Davida S. Perry
Represented By: Brian Adam Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Feijoo
Represented By: Davida S. Perry
Represented By: Brian Adam Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Represented By: Bilal Husain Haider
Represented By: Lawrence John Profeta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Carranza
Represented By: Bilal Husain Haider
Represented By: Lawrence John Profeta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?