Geographic Location Innovations LLC v. Borghese, Inc.
Plaintiff: Geographic Location Innovations LLC
Defendant: Borghese, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv07630
Filed: September 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Plaintiff Geographic Location Innovations, LLC ("Plaintiff" and/or "GLI") files this Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). According to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i), an action may be dismissed by the plaintiff without order of court by filing a notice of dismissal at any time before service by the adverse party of an answer. Accordingly, Plaintiff hereby voluntarily dismisses this action against Defendant Borghese, Inc. without prejudice, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) with each party to bear its own fees and costs. SO ORDERED., Borghese, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/09/2021) (ama)
November 9, 2021 Filing 19 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE TERMINATED - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 11/8/2021 in a court action filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).(km)
November 8, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Borghese, Inc.. Document filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Johnson, Jay)
October 26, 2021 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order and Notice of Initial Conference served on Defendant Borghese, Inc. on October 15, 2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, by December 30, 2021, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: As set forth herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial status conference on January 7, 2022 at 12:15 pm. The Court will hold this conference by telephone. The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call into the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. Plaintiff is ordered to serve Defendant with a copy of this order and to file an affidavit on ECF certifying that such service has been effectuated. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 1/7/2022 at 12:15 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/14/2021) (ama)
October 13, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Borghese, Inc. served on 9/21/2021, answer due 11/11/2021. Service was accepted by Robin Huttbanks. Document filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #10 Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jay Johnson dated October 5, 2021. Application granted. SO ORDERED. Borghese, Inc. answer due 11/11/2021. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/7/2021) (vfr)
October 5, 2021 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #10 Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jay Johnson dated October 5, 2021. Document filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Jay Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc)
September 29, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 AMENDED MOTION for Jay Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 28, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED MOTION for Jay Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Johnson, Jay)
September 24, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Kenneth M. Karas is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
September 24, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
September 16, 2021 Filing 10 COMPLAINT against Borghese, Inc.. Document filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Johnson, Jay)
September 16, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #8 MOTION for Jay Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25066875. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas and Colorado; missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC. Related Document Number: #8 ..(Johnson, Jay) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 9/16/2021 (wb).
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jay Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25066875. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit).(Johnson, Jay) Modified on 9/16/2021 (wb).
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(vf)
September 14, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Borghese, Inc. (vf)
September 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jay B. Johnson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
September 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jay B. Johnson to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
September 14, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
September 14, 2021 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
September 14, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
September 13, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Patent Asset Management, LLC for Geographic Location Innovations LLC. Document filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
September 13, 2021 Filing 4 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Johnson, Jay)
September 13, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BORGHESE, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
September 13, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Johnson, Jay)
September 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Geographic Location Innovations LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25054832)Document filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Johnson, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geographic Location Innovations LLC v. Borghese, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geographic Location Innovations LLC
Represented By: Jay B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borghese, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?