Borncamp v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sandra R Borncamp
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc. and Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv07705
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. served on 10/11/2021, answer due 11/1/2021; Zimmer US, Inc. served on 10/11/2021, answer due 11/1/2021; Zimmer, Inc. served on 10/11/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. Document filed by Sandra R Borncamp..(Relkin, Ellen)
September 17, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea)
September 17, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
September 17, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
September 16, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc...(gp)
September 16, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer, Inc...(gp)
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer US, Inc...(gp)
September 16, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Crotty as possibly related to 1:18-md-2859 (PAC). (gp)
September 16, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
September 16, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(gp)
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sandra R Borncamp..(Relkin, Ellen)
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer US, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sandra R Borncamp..(Relkin, Ellen)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sandra R Borncamp..(Relkin, Ellen)
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-md-2859. Document filed by Sandra R Borncamp..(Relkin, Ellen)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Relkin, Ellen)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25063061)Document filed by Sandra R Borncamp..(Relkin, Ellen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borncamp v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra R Borncamp
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?