Adamski v. Zimmer Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eleanor Adamski
Defendant: Zimmer Inc., Zimmer US Inc., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. and Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv07725
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. served on 9/17/2021, answer due 10/8/2021; Zimmer Inc. served on 9/17/2021, answer due 10/8/2021; Zimmer US Inc. served on 9/17/2021, answer due 10/8/2021. Service was made by E-mail. Document filed by Eleanor Adamski..(Anapol, Thomas)
September 17, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea)
September 17, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
September 17, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
September 16, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. (sj)
September 16, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer Inc.. (sj)
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer US Inc.. (sj)
September 16, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Crotty as possibly related to 1:18md2859. (sj)
September 16, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
September 16, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
September 16, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thomas R. Anapol. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); Dollar Demand $75,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 8 (Multidistrict Litigation - Direct File); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $75,000. (sj)
September 16, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas R. Anapol. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party type was entered incorrectly. (sj)
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Eleanor Adamski..(Anapol, Thomas)
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Eleanor Adamski..(Anapol, Thomas)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer US, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Eleanor Adamski..(Anapol, Thomas)
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-MD-2859(PAC) / 18-MC-2859 (PAC). Document filed by Eleanor Adamski..(Anapol, Thomas)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Anapol, Thomas)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Inc., Zimmer US Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25065607)Document filed by Eleanor Adamski..(Anapol, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adamski v. Zimmer Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor Adamski
Represented By: Thomas R. Anapol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?