Khan v. Garland et al
Plaintiff: Sajjad Hussain Khan
Defendant: US Attorney General Merrick Garland, Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas, Director Tracy Renaud, Director Terri Robinson, Director Susan Quintana and Director Christopher Wray
Case Number: 1:2021cv07738
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, that this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs or fees to any party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/4/2021) (rro)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Susan Quintana, Tracy Renaud, Terri Robinson, Christopher Wray..(Byars, Michael)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on January 27, 2022, at 2:30 p.m. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. Initial Conference set for 1/27/2022 at 02:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/28/2021) (rro)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Susan Quintana, Tracy Renaud, Terri Robinson, Christopher Wray..(Byars, Michael)
September 16, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 16, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
September 16, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Shao, Aileen)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Susan Quintana, Tracy Renaud, Terri Robinson, Christopher Wray (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25067157).Document filed by Sajjad Hussain Khan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supporting Documents).(Shao, Aileen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. Garland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sajjad Hussain Khan
Represented By: Aileen Shao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney General Merrick Garland
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Tracy Renaud
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Terri Robinson
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Susan Quintana
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Christopher Wray
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?