McFarlane v. Heyday Wellness LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tricia McFarlane
Defendant: Heyday Wellness LLC, Chrissy Carrano, Alexandra Serron, Joshua Taveras and Marcy Mancina
Case Number: 1:2021cv07797
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 11/26/2021. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/15) (jpt)
November 16, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chrissy Carrano(In Her Official Capacity), Chrissy Carrano(In Her Individual Capacity), Heyday Wellness LLC, Marcy Mancina(In Her Individual Capacity), Marcy Mancina(In Her Official Capacity), Alexandra Serron(In Her Individual Capacity), Alexandra Serron (In Her Official Capacity), Joshua Taveras(In His Individual Capacity), Joshua Taveras(In His Official Capacity)..(Hardy, Tamika)
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Heyday Wellness LLC..(Hardy, Tamika)
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tamika Nicole Hardy on behalf of Chrissy Carrano(In Her Official Capacity), Chrissy Carrano(In Her Individual Capacity), Heyday Wellness LLC, Marcy Mancina(In Her Individual Capacity), Marcy Mancina(In Her Official Capacity), Alexandra Serron(In Her Individual Capacity), Alexandra Serron (In Her Official Capacity), Joshua Taveras(In His Individual Capacity), Joshua Taveras(In His Official Capacity)..(Hardy, Tamika)
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Chrissy Carrano(In Her Official Capacity) waiver sent on 9/17/2021, answer due 11/16/2021; Chrissy Carrano(In Her Individual Capacity) waiver sent on 9/17/2021, answer due 11/16/2021; Heyday Wellness LLC waiver sent on 9/17/2021, answer due 11/16/2021; Marcy Mancina(In Her Individual Capacity) waiver sent on 9/17/2021, answer due 11/16/2021; Marcy Mancina(In Her Official Capacity) waiver sent on 9/17/2021, answer due 11/16/2021; Alexandra Serron(In Her Individual Capacity) waiver sent on 9/17/2021, answer due 11/16/2021; Alexandra Serron (In Her Official Capacity) waiver sent on 9/17/2021, answer due 11/16/2021; Joshua Taveras(In His Individual Capacity) waiver sent on 9/17/2021, answer due 11/16/2021; Joshua Taveras(In His Official Capacity) waiver sent on 9/17/2021, answer due 11/16/2021. Document filed by Tricia McFarlane..(Calliste, Gregory)
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chrissy Carrano(In Her Official Capacity), Chrissy Carrano(In Her Individual Capacity), Heyday Wellness LLC, Marcy Mancina(In Her Individual Capacity), Marcy Mancina(In Her Official Capacity), Alexandra Serron(In Her Individual Capacity), Alexandra Serron (In Her Official Capacity), Joshua Taveras(In His Individual Capacity), Joshua Taveras(In His Official Capacity). (sj)
September 20, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
September 20, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
September 20, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yusha D Hiraman on behalf of Tricia McFarlane..(Hiraman, Yusha)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Calliste, Gregory)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Heyday Wellness LLC, Chrissy Carrano, Alexandra Serron, Joshua Taveras, and Marcy Mancina, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Tricia McFarlane..(Calliste, Gregory)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chrissy Carrano(In Her Official Capacity), Chrissy Carrano(In Her Individual Capacity), Heyday Wellness LLC, Marcy Mancina(In Her Individual Capacity), Marcy Mancina(In Her Official Capacity), Alexandra Serron(In Her Individual Capacity), Alexandra Serron (In Her Official Capacity), Joshua Taveras(In His Individual Capacity), Joshua Taveras(In His Official Capacity). (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25076434)Document filed by Tricia McFarlane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Exhibit B - Notice Letter).(Calliste, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFarlane v. Heyday Wellness LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tricia McFarlane
Represented By: Yusha D Hiraman
Represented By: Gregory Calliste, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heyday Wellness LLC
Represented By: Tamika Nicole Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrissy Carrano
Represented By: Tamika Nicole Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandra Serron
Represented By: Tamika Nicole Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Taveras
Represented By: Tamika Nicole Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcy Mancina
Represented By: Tamika Nicole Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?