Lehnert v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Lehnert
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv07806
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Trans Union, LLC. Defendant Equifax is overdue in answering or otherwise responding to the Complaint. It is hereby: ORDERED that Defendant Equifax is directed to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before December 15, 2021. SO ORDERED. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 12/15/2021. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 11/15/2021) (kv)
November 8, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Harris, Justin)
October 7, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Trans Union, LLC..(Nicodemus, Camille)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint until November 8, 2021. addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Justin Harris dated September 29, 2021.Application Granted. SO ORDERED. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 11/8/2021. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/30/2021) (ama)
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint until November 8, 2021 addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Justin Harris dated September 29, 2021. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Harris, Justin)
September 29, 2021 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Harris, Justin)
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin Harris on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Harris, Justin)
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Paul Russo on behalf of Sharon Lehnert..(Russo, Patrick)
September 20, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
September 20, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
September 20, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. Document filed by Trans Union, LLC..(Nicodemus, Camille)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Camille Renee Nicodemus on behalf of Trans Union, LLC..(Nicodemus, Camille)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nicodemus, Camille)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 158431/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25078274).Document filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons to Trans Union, LLC, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint to Trans Union, LLC).(Nicodemus, Camille)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lehnert v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Lehnert
Represented By: Patrick Paul Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Camille Renee Nicodemus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?