Mapes v. United Services Automobile Association
Plaintiff: Christine Mapes
Defendant: United Services Automobile Association
Case Number: 1:2021cv07853
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 dj
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 14 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New York Eastern; Case Number: 2:21-cv-04534. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
September 21, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
September 21, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Vincent L. Briccetti as possibly related to 7:21-cv-5813. (sjo)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Motion to Change Venue: Upon the parties' joint request, the Clerk of the Court is requested to transfer this action to the Southern District of New York. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 9/17/2021. (Minerva, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.]
September 16, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of New York Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Christine Mapes. (Levis, Christian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Christina on behalf of Christine Mapes (notification declined or already on case) (Christina, Anthony) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil K. Gilman on behalf of United Services Automobile Association (notification declined or already on case) (Gilman, Neil) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.]
August 26, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anthony M. Christina Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14785374. by Christine Mapes. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Pennsylvania Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - New Jersey Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit C - Washington, D.C. Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order) (Christina, Anthony) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.]
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: The attorney shall register for ECF; registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of all activity in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 8/26/2021. (Minerva, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.]
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: The attorney shall register for ECF; registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of all activity in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 8/26/2021. (Minerva, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.]
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: United Services Automobile Association answer due 9/28/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 8/26/2021. (Minerva, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14785229. by United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 L.R. 1.3 Affidavit for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - New York, #4 Proposed Order) (Gilman, Neil) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by United Services Automobile Association. (Ghiam, Armin) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Services Automobile Association (Ghiam, Armin) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Armin Ghiam on behalf of United Services Automobile Association (aty to be noticed) (Ghiam, Armin) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.]
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christine Mapes. United Services Automobile Association served on 8/17/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Levis, Christian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United Services Automobile Association. (Landow, Concetta) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.]
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Services Automobile Association filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14743664 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Christine Mapes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Levis, Christian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mapes v. United Services Automobile Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Mapes
Represented By: Anthony Christina
Represented By: Christian Levis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Services Automobile Association
Represented By: Armin Ghiam
Represented By: Neil K. Gilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?