Spottswood Companies, Inc. v. Marsh USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Spottswood Companies, Inc.
Defendant: Marsh U.S.A. Inc. and Marsh & McLennan Agency LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv07855
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 nr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 23 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Florida Southern; Case Number: 4:21-cv-10064. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
September 21, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
September 21, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
September 21, 2021 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
September 21, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sjo)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Transfer to the USDC for the SD/NY. Case Closed Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 9/20/2021. See attached document for full details. (jao) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/21/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #20 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 8/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/21/2021.]
August 26, 2021 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Scheduling Conference Report and Proposed Scheduling Order by MARSH & McLENNAN AGENCY LLC, Marsh USA, Inc.. Responses due by 9/9/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roldan Cora, Javier) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/21/2021.]
August 26, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION To Transfer Venue filed by MARSH & McLENNAN AGENCY LLC, Marsh USA, Inc.. (Leibell, Martha) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/21/2021.]
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Response to Motion to Transfer Venue. Replies due by 8/26/2021. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 8/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/21/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Filing 17 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, by MARSH & McLENNAN AGENCY LLC, Marsh USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leibell, Martha) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/21/2021.]
August 12, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION To Transfer Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Spottswood Companies, Inc.. Attorney Max Nathaniel Panoff added to party Spottswood Companies, Inc.(pty:pla). Replies due by 8/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - 2020 Unsigned CSA)(Panoff, Max) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/21/2021.]
August 11, 2021 Filing 15 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against MARSH & McLENNAN AGENCY LLC, Marsh USA, Inc., filed by Spottswood Companies, Inc..(Leighton, John) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/21/2021.]
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Transfer Venue. Responses due by 7/12/2021 Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 7/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/21/2021.]
July 27, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #9 MOTION To Transfer Venue by Spottswood Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, Jay) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/21/2021.]
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Michael C. D'Agostino, Esq.. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 7/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/21/2021.]
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by MARSH & McLENNAN AGENCY LLC, Marsh USA, Inc. re #9 MOTION To Transfer Venue of Filing Corrected Exhibit A (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of John Martin) (Leibell, Martha) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/21/2021.]
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael C. D'Agostino. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14840903 by MARSH & McLENNAN AGENCY LLC, Marsh USA, Inc.. Responses due by 7/27/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Leibell, Martha) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/21/2021.]
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION To Transfer Venue by MARSH & McLENNAN AGENCY LLC, Marsh USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of John Martin, #2 Exhibit B-Litigation Analytics Report for USDC)(Leibell, Martha) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/21/2021.]
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying Low-Numbered Transfer re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by MARSH & McLENNAN AGENCY LLC, Marsh USA, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 7/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/21/2021.]
July 7, 2021 Filing 7 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Michael C. D'Agostino, mailing date July 7, 2021, (pt) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/21/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARSH & McLENNAN AGENCY LLC, Marsh USA, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Marsh, LLC, Other Affiliate Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc. for MARSH & McLENNAN AGENCY LLC; Corporate Parent Marsh, LLC, Other Affiliate Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc. for Marsh USA, Inc. (Leibell, Martha) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/21/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re #4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (jao) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/21/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARSH & McLENNAN AGENCY LLC, Marsh USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Marsh, LLC for MARSH & McLENNAN AGENCY LLC, Marsh USA, Inc. (Leibell, Martha) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/21/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by MARSH & McLENNAN AGENCY LLC, Marsh USA, Inc. (Leibell, Martha) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/21/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/21/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14822007, filed by MARSH & McLENNAN AGENCY LLC, Marsh USA, Inc.. No Answer and/or Motion to Dismiss Filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leibell, Martha) Modified on 7/6/2021 (jao). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/21/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spottswood Companies, Inc. v. Marsh USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spottswood Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Jay Mitchell Levy
Represented By: John Elliott Leighton
Represented By: Max Nathaniel Panoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsh U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Javier Alexander Roldan Cora
Represented By: Michael C. D'Agostino
Represented By: Sarah Jayne Cohen
Represented By: Martha Anne Leibell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsh & McLennan Agency LLC
Represented By: Javier Alexander Roldan Cora
Represented By: Michael C. D'Agostino
Represented By: Sarah Jayne Cohen
Represented By: Martha Anne Leibell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?