Lowry et al v. Edelman et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Lowry and Spartan Capital Securities, LLC
Defendant: Vix Capital Partners, LP, Gabriel Edelman, Vix Capital Partners, LLLC, Nehemia Markovits, Edelman Blockchain Advisors, Louis Taubman, Esq., Hunter Taubman Fischer & Li LLC, IFM Investors, Interactive Brokers, Chen Edelman and Jiyson Edelman
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Jonathan Lowry, derivatively on behalf of Vix Capital Partners, LP f/k/a Vix Capital Partners, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv07861
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 sv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: granting #38 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Application Granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 38. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/12/2021) (ama)
November 12, 2021 Filing 38 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Individual Motions to Dismiss on behalf of Three Defendant Groups Interactive Brokers LLC, the Taubman Defendants, and the Edelman Defendants addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Todd S. Fishman dated November 12, 2021. Document filed by Interactive Brokers..(Fishman, Todd)
November 10, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Kaim Bussey on behalf of Interactive Brokers..(Bussey, Alexander)
October 15, 2021 Filing 36 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hunter Taubman Fischer & Li LLC, Louis Taubman, Esq...(Proscia, Anthony)
October 15, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Proscia on behalf of Hunter Taubman Fischer & Li LLC, Louis Taubman, Esq...(Proscia, Anthony)
October 15, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett A. Scher on behalf of Hunter Taubman Fischer & Li LLC, Louis Taubman, Esq...(Scher, Brett)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: To avoid anticipated requests from the various Defendants in this case, the deadline for all Defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to December 2, 2021. Further, to allow for the efficient resolution of the issues presented, any motion to dismiss the Complaint shall be filed jointly, unless a Defendant seeks and obtains leave of the Court to supplement the joint filing or to file individually. The briefing schedule adopted in ECF No. 30 is retained: Plaintiffs' opposition to any motion to dismiss is due by January 18, 2022, and Defendants' reply, if any, is due by February 8, 2022. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 31. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/15/2021) Chen Edelman answer due 12/2/2021; Jiyson Edelman answer due 12/2/2021; Hunter Taubman Fischer & Li LLC answer due 12/2/2021; IFM Investors answer due 12/2/2021; Interactive Brokers answer due 12/2/2021; Nehemia Markovits answer due 12/2/2021; Louis Taubman, Esq. answer due 12/2/2021. (ks)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 31. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/14/21) (yv)
October 15, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Gabriel Edelman answer due 12/2/2021; Edelman Blockchain Advisors answer due 12/2/2021; Vix Capital Partners, LP answer due 12/2/2021. (yv)
October 14, 2021 Filing 31 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Move re Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Mark J. Astarita dated October 14, 2021. Document filed by Gabriel Edelman, Edelman Blockchain Advisors, Vix Capital Partners, LP..(Astarita, Mark)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #26 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #26 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, and to Approve Briefing Schedule addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Todd S. Fishman dated October 14, 2021. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate ECF No. 26. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/14/21) (yv)
October 14, 2021 Filing 29 LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Robert Brookman, Esquire, counsel for the Plaintiffs dated October 14, 2021 re: #26 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, and to Approve Briefing Schedule addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Todd S. Fishman dated October 14, 2021. . Document filed by Jonathan Lowry, derivatively on behalf of Vix Capital Partners, LP f/k/a Vix Capital Partners, LLC, Jonathan Lowry, Spartan Capital Securities, LLC..(Brookman, Robert)
October 14, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark J. Astarita on behalf of Gabriel Edelman, Edelman Blockchain Advisors, Vix Capital Partners, LP..(Astarita, Mark)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER with respect to #26 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Plaintiffs shall file a response no later than October 15, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
October 14, 2021 Filing 26 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, and to Approve Briefing Schedule addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Todd S. Fishman dated October 14, 2021. Document filed by Interactive Brokers..(Fishman, Todd)
October 14, 2021 Filing 25 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Interactive Brokers Group, Inc., Corporate Parent IBG LLC for Interactive Brokers. Document filed by Interactive Brokers..(Fishman, Todd)
October 14, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd Steven Fishman on behalf of Interactive Brokers..(Fishman, Todd)
October 14, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eugene Edward Ingoglia on behalf of Interactive Brokers..(Ingoglia, Eugene)
October 14, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 12/2/2021. Responses due by 1/18/2022. Replies due by 2/8/2022. (yv)
September 23, 2021 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Edelman Blockchain Advisors. (sj)
September 23, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/7/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/23/2021) (tg)
September 23, 2021 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Spartan Capital Securities, LLC, Jonathan Lowry, Jonathan Lowry, derivatively on behalf of Vix Capital Partners, LP f/k/a Vix Capital Partners, LLC added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,.Document filed by Spartan Capital Securities, LLC, Jonathan Lowry, Jonathan Lowry, derivatively on behalf of Vix Capital Partners, LP f/k/a Vix Capital Partners, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint,,..(Brookman, Robert)
September 22, 2021 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Edelman Blockchain Advisors, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jonathan Lowry, Spartan Capital Securities, LLC..(Brookman, Robert)
September 22, 2021 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vix Capital Partners, LP..(jgo)
September 22, 2021 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nehemia Markovits..(jgo)
September 22, 2021 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Louis Taubman, Esq...(jgo)
September 22, 2021 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jiyson Edelman..(jgo)
September 22, 2021 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Interactive Brokers..(jgo)
September 22, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to IFM Investors..(jgo)
September 22, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hunter Taubman Fischer & Li LLC..(jgo)
September 22, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gabriel Edelman..(jgo)
September 22, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chen Edelman..(jgo)
September 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Robert Elliot Brookman. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
September 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert Elliot Brookman re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add party Jonathan Lowry with party text 'derivatively on behalf of Vix Capital Partners, LP f/k/a Vix Capital Partners, LLC'. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo)
September 22, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert Elliot Brookman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jonathan Lowry; Spartan Capital Securities, LLC; Gabriel Edelman; Vix Capital Partners, LP; Nehemia Markovits; Edelman Blockchain Advisors; Louis Taubman; Hunter Taubman Fischer & Li LLC; IFM Investors; Interactive Brokers; Chen Edelman; Jiyson Edelman. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
September 22, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 22, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 21, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vix Capital Partners, LP f/k/a Vix Capital Partners, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jonathan Lowry, Spartan Capital Securities, LLC..(Brookman, Robert)
September 21, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nehemia Markovits, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jonathan Lowry, Spartan Capital Securities, LLC..(Brookman, Robert)
September 21, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Louis Taubman, Esquire, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jonathan Lowry, Spartan Capital Securities, LLC..(Brookman, Robert)
September 21, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jiyson Edelman, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jonathan Lowry, Spartan Capital Securities, LLC..(Brookman, Robert)
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Interactive Brokers, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jonathan Lowry, Spartan Capital Securities, LLC..(Brookman, Robert)
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to IFM Investors, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jonathan Lowry, Spartan Capital Securities, LLC..(Brookman, Robert)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hunter Taubman Fischer & Li LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jonathan Lowry, Spartan Capital Securities, LLC..(Brookman, Robert)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gabriel Edelman, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jonathan Lowry, Spartan Capital Securities, LLC..(Brookman, Robert)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chen Edelman, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jonathan Lowry, Spartan Capital Securities, LLC..(Brookman, Robert)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chen Edelman, Gabriel Edelman, Jiyson Edelman, Edelman Blockchain Advisors, Hunter Taubman Fischer & Li LLC, IFM Investors, Interactive Brokers, Nehemia Markovits, Louis Taubman, Vix Capital Partners, LP f/k/a Vix Capital Partners, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25089010)Document filed by Spartan Capital Securities, LLC, Jonathan Lowry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 1 -- IC Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 2 -- Amendment to IC Agreement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Vix Capital Partners' Systematic Operations Strategy, June 2019).(Brookman, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowry et al v. Edelman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vix Capital Partners, LP
Represented By: Mark J. Astarita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Edelman
Represented By: Mark J. Astarita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vix Capital Partners, LLLC
Represented By: Mark J. Astarita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nehemia Markovits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edelman Blockchain Advisors
Represented By: Mark J. Astarita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Taubman, Esq.
Represented By: Brett A. Scher
Represented By: Anthony Proscia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Taubman Fischer & Li LLC
Represented By: Brett A. Scher
Represented By: Anthony Proscia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IFM Investors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interactive Brokers
Represented By: Eugene Edward Ingoglia
Represented By: Todd Steven Fishman
Represented By: Alexander Kaim Bussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chen Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jiyson Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Lowry
Represented By: Robert Elliot Brookman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spartan Capital Securities, LLC
Represented By: Robert Elliot Brookman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Jonathan Lowry, derivatively on behalf of Vix Capital Partners, LP f/k/a Vix Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: Robert Elliot Brookman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?