Khan v. United States Department of Defense et al
Plaintiff: Azmat Khan
Defendant: United States Department of Defense, United States Central Command and United States Agency for International Development
Case Number: 1:2021cv08105
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
November 17, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so redesignated. (aea)
November 17, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-cv-05334-DLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea)
November 15, 2021 Filing 11 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Plaintiff Azmat Khan and Defendants United States Department of Defense, United States Central Command, and United States Agency for International Development dated November 15, 2021 re: Initial Meet & Confer. Document filed by Azmat Khan..(Townsend, Katielynn)
November 8, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by United States Agency for International Development, United States Central Command, United States Department of Defense..(Normand, Sarah)
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order Scheduling an Initial Pretrial Conference served on United States Department of Defense, United States Central Command, United States Agency for International Development, United States Attorneys Office on 10/20/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Azmat Khan..(Townsend, Katielynn)
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Sheive Normand on behalf of United States Agency for International Development, United States Central Command, United States Department of Defense..(Normand, Sarah)
October 19, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). United States Agency for International Development served on 10/12/2021, answer due 11/12/2021; United States Central Command served on 10/8/2021, answer due 11/8/2021; United States Department of Defense served on 10/7/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Azmat Khan..(Townsend, Katielynn)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/6/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. Parties should dial in at 1(888)363-4749, access code (9054506) to join the conference. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/14/2021) (ks)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Agency for International Development, United States Central Command, United States Department of Defense..(jgo)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Defense, United States Central Command, United States Agency for International Development, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Azmat Khan..(Townsend, Katielynn)
October 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
October 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
October 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Katielynn Boyd Townsend to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Create one summons form and use a rider to list each party and their addresses;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Defense, United States Central Command, United States Agency for International Development, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Azmat Khan..(Townsend, Katielynn) Modified on 10/1/2021 (pc).
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Townsend, Katielynn)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Agency for International Development, United States Central Command, United States Department of Defense. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25131219)Document filed by Azmat Khan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18).(Townsend, Katielynn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. United States Department of Defense et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azmat Khan
Represented By: Katielynn Boyd Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Defense
Represented By: Sarah Sheive Normand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Central Command
Represented By: Sarah Sheive Normand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Agency for International Development
Represented By: Sarah Sheive Normand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?