Alexsam, Inc. v. American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc
Plaintiff: Alexsam, Inc.
Defendant: American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv08116
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Texas Eastern; Case Number: 2:21-cv-00347. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
September 30, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
September 30, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
September 30, 2021 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
September 30, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Paul A. Crotty. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sjo)
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy C Davis on behalf of Alexsam, Inc. (Davis, Timothy) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/30/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacqueline K Burt on behalf of Alexsam, Inc. (Burt, Jacqueline) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/30/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan R Miller on behalf of Alexsam, Inc. (Miller, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/30/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 Defendant American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.'s ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint (Third), COUNTERCLAIM against Alexsam, Inc. by American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc.(Findlay, Eric) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/30/2021.]
September 15, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/30/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Filing 3 FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE. PLEASE SEE DKT #4 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint (klc, ) Modified on 9/22/2021 (klc, ). Modified on 9/22/2021 (klc, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/30/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(klc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/30/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER TO TRANSFER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/03/2021. (klc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/30/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexsam, Inc. v. American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexsam, Inc.
Represented By: William Joseph Cornelius, Jr
Represented By: Jacqueline K Burt
Represented By: Jonathan Robert Miller
Represented By: Timothy C Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc.
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Lupco (Lewis) V Popovski
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?