Mejia et al v. Connies Deli Food Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Iris Janeth Mejia
Defendant: Connies Deli Food Inc. doing business as Connies Deli and Concepcion Mendoza
Case Number: 1:2021cv08182
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re: #10 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, Set Hearings. It is hereby ORDERED that by December 6, 2021, the parties shall file the joint letter in accordance with the instructions in the Order at Dkt. No. 10. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/2/2021) (kv)
December 1, 2021 Filing 23 PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT . Document filed by Iris Janeth Mejia(individually ), Iris Janeth Mejia(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Barton, Jesse)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER with respect to #21 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Defendants' request for an adjournment will be addressed once the parties file the initial conference materials, which are due no later than December 2, 2021, at noon. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/30/2021) (kv)
November 30, 2021 Filing 21 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from MICHAEL K. CHONG, ESQ dated November 30, 2021. Document filed by Connies Deli Food Inc., Concepcion Mendoza..(Chong, Michael)
November 30, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Connies Deli Food Inc., Concepcion Mendoza..(Chong, Michael)
November 17, 2021 Filing 19 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #18 Affirmation in Support of Motion, filed by Iris Janeth Mejia. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Michael Faillace as counsel for Plaintiff in this case. Attorney Michael Antonio Faillace terminated. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/17/2021) (mml)
November 16, 2021 Filing 18 AFFIRMATION of Catalina Sojo, Esq. in Support re: #16 MOTION for Michael Faillace to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Iris Janeth Mejia(individually ), Iris Janeth Mejia(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina)
November 8, 2021 Filing 17 MEMO ENDORSEMENT denying without prejudice #16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Application DENIED without prejudice. Mr. Faillace shall file an application in compliance with Local Civil Rule 1.4, including a statement about "whether or not the attorney is asserting a retaining or charging lien." Alternatively, according to the Committee Note, counsel may be substituted by a "stipulation which has been signed by counsel, the counsel's client, and all other parties." (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/8/2021) (rro)
November 7, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Michael Faillace to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Iris Janeth Mejia(individually ), Iris Janeth Mejia(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
November 7, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Catalina Sojo on behalf of Iris Janeth Mejia(individually ), Iris Janeth Mejia(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Parties in the above captioned action, acting by means of their respective counsel, that the time for Defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond with respect to the Complaint in the above captioned matter is hereby extended to 30 days from the date this Stipulation is so ordered by the Court. There has been no previous request for an extension of time. Defendants reserve all defenses to this action except as to service. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, this stipulation may be signed in counterparts and a facsimile or electronic signature shall be sufficient for all purposes. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/25/2021) (vfr)
October 25, 2021 Filing 13 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Connies Deli Food Inc., Concepcion Mendoza..(Chong, Michael)
October 18, 2021 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Connies Deli Food Inc...(Chong, Michael)
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael K. Chong on behalf of Connies Deli Food Inc., Concepcion Mendoza..(Chong, Michael)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that a telephonic conference will be held on December 9, 2021 at 10:50a.m. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. The telephonic conference is public, and the time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time, as further set forth. DATE AND TIME OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE: December 9, 2021 at 10:50a.m. IPTC MATERIALS DUE: December 2, 2021 at noon. (Telephone Conference set for 12/9/2021 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Initial Conference set for 12/9/2021 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/18/2021) (mml)
October 7, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jesse S Barton on behalf of Iris Janeth Mejia(individually ), Iris Janeth Mejia(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Barton, Jesse)
October 6, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Connies Deli Food Inc...(sj)
October 6, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Concepcion Mendoza. (sj)
October 5, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Connies Deli Food Inc. (d/b/a Connies Deli), re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Iris Janeth Mejia(individually ), Iris Janeth Mejia(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Concepcion Mendoza, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Iris Janeth Mejia(individually ), Iris Janeth Mejia(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
October 5, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
October 5, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
October 5, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael Antonio Faillace to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name on the PDF case caption contains a typographical error;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
October 5, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Concepcion Mendoza, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Iris Janeth Mejia(individually ), Iris Janeth Mejia(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael) Modified on 10/5/2021 (jgo).
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Connies Deli Food Inc. (d/b/a Connies Deli), re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Iris Janeth Mejia(individually ), Iris Janeth Mejia(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael) Modified on 10/5/2021 (jgo).
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Faillace, Michael)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Connies Deli Food Inc., Concepcion Mendoza. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25148203)Document filed by Iris Janeth Mejia(individually ), Iris Janeth Mejia(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mejia et al v. Connies Deli Food Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris Janeth Mejia
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Catalina Sojo
Represented By: Jesse S Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connies Deli Food Inc. doing business as Connies Deli
Represented By: Michael K. Chong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concepcion Mendoza
Represented By: Michael K. Chong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?