Domagala v. Zimmer Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Linda Domagala
Defendant: Zimmer Inc., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer US Inc., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. and Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv08194
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/7/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(Moya, Goretti)
October 19, 2021 Filing 7 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/7/2021 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/9/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(Moya, Goretti)
October 8, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
October 8, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
October 8, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
October 8, 2021 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
October 6, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Inc., Zimmer US Inc. (vf)
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Czelusta, Eric)
October 6, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Crotty as possibly related to 1:18-MD-2859. (vf)
October 6, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
October 6, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf)
October 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Eric Czelusta. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer US Inc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; alias party name was entered incorrectly. (vf)
October 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Eric Czelusta to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Courthouse Assignment Section not selected on Form. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
October 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Eric Czelusta. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Citizenship Plaintiff code 7 (NONE); Citizenship Defendant code 7 (NONE). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 4 (Diversity); the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 2 (Citizen of Another State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State). (vf)
October 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Eric Czelusta. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code White Plains; Dollar Demand Blank. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to Foley Square; the Dollar Demand has been modified to 75,000. (vf)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Linda Domagala..(Czelusta, Eric)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-MD-2859 (PAC) 18-MC-2859 (PAC). Document filed by Linda Domagala..(Czelusta, Eric)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Czelusta, Eric) Modified on 10/6/2021 (vf).
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Inc., Zimmer US Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25149624)Document filed by Linda Domagala..(Czelusta, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Domagala v. Zimmer Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Domagala
Represented By: Eric Czelusta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?