Webb v. Pfizer, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shannon Webb
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv08244
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 fr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/13/2022 at 04:00 PM in telephone or video conference before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on December 3, 2021) (ide)
November 5, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Jesse M. Furman is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
November 5, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-06789-DLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea)
November 5, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so redesignated. (aea)
October 27, 2021 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-06789. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc...(Gulliver, Colleen)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for David J. Stanoch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Ruben Honik to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
October 26, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Ruben Honik to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25238654. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 26, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for David J. Stanoch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25238855. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for David J. Stanoch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25238855. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Shannon Webb. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing).(Stanoch, David)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Ruben Honik to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25238654. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Shannon Webb. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing).(Honik, Ruben)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/12/2022 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/7/2021) (va)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pfizer, Inc. (vf)
October 7, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Peter Samberg. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); Dollar Demand 5,000,000,001; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to 5,000,000; the County code has been modified to Schenectady. (vf)
October 7, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Peter Samberg. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Shannon Webb. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
October 7, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
October 7, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
October 7, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pfizer, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Shannon Webb..(Samberg, Peter)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Samberg, Peter)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pfizer, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25157971)Document filed by Shannon Webb..(Samberg, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Pfizer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Webb
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Ruben Honik
Represented By: David John Stanoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?