Ramirez v. Garland et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Armando Ramirez
Defendant: Merrick Garland, Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas, Director, USCIS Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Timothy J Houghton, Field Office Directo SUSAN QUINTANA, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou and Susan Quintana
Case Number: 1:2021cv08245
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1447
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alejandro Mayorkas. (vf)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel, that:1. This action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs or attorney's fees to either party pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4l(a)(2).2. Within 45 days of the entry of this Order, USCIS shall adjudicate the plaintiffs FormN-400.3. Nothing in this Order shall preclude USCIS from taking other action such as (but not limited to) conducting further interviews, requesting briefing or evidence, collecting biometric data, or seeking any other information USCIS deems relevant to the plaintiff's eligibility for naturalization prior to his oath ceremony. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate all open motions and close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/22/2021) (tg)
October 22, 2021 Filing 30 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Alejandro Mayorkas;, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Carlos Armando Ramirez..(Mills, Thomas)
October 22, 2021 Filing 29 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Merrick Garland, Timothy J Houghton, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Susan Quintana..(Byars, Michael)
October 22, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of Merrick Garland, Timothy J Houghton, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Susan Quintana..(Byars, Michael)
October 20, 2021 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Merrick Garland..(jgo)
October 19, 2021 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Merrick Garland c/o Damian Williams, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Carlos Armando Ramirez..(Mills, Thomas)
October 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Thomas Joseph Mills to RE-FILE Document No. #25 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
October 15, 2021 Filing 25 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Merrick Garland c/o Damian Williams, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Carlos Armando Ramirez..(Mills, Thomas) Modified on 10/18/2021 (jgo).
October 15, 2021 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Timothy J Houghton..(pc)
October 15, 2021 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou..(pc)
October 15, 2021 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Susan Quintana..(pc)
October 15, 2021 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Merrick Garland..(pc)
October 15, 2021 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alejandro Mayorkas..(pc)
October 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Thomas Joseph Mills to RE-FILE Document No. #19 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Only parties listed on the complaint caption title can be issued a summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
October 14, 2021 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Damian Williams, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Carlos Armando Ramirez..(Mills, Thomas) Modified on 10/15/2021 (pc).
October 14, 2021 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Susan Quintana, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Carlos Armando Ramirez..(Mills, Thomas)
October 14, 2021 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Timothy J. Houghton;, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Carlos Armando Ramirez..(Mills, Thomas)
October 14, 2021 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou;, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Carlos Armando Ramirez..(Mills, Thomas)
October 14, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Mayorkas;, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Carlos Armando Ramirez..(Mills, Thomas)
October 14, 2021 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Merrick Garland;, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Carlos Armando Ramirez..(Mills, Thomas)
October 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Thomas Joseph Mills to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #12 Request for Issuance of Summons, #10 Request for Issuance of Summons, #13 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party information on the PDF case caption must match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption and must not be abbreviated; party name on the PDF 'To' section must match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
October 13, 2021 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Damian Williams, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Carlos Armando Ramirez..(Mills, Thomas) Modified on 10/14/2021 (jgo).
October 13, 2021 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Susan Quintana, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Carlos Armando Ramirez..(Mills, Thomas) Modified on 10/14/2021 (jgo).
October 13, 2021 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Timothy J. Houghton;, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Carlos Armando Ramirez..(Mills, Thomas) Modified on 10/14/2021 (jgo).
October 13, 2021 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou;, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Carlos Armando Ramirez..(Mills, Thomas) Modified on 10/14/2021 (jgo).
October 13, 2021 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Mayorkas;, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Carlos Armando Ramirez..(Mills, Thomas) Modified on 10/14/2021 (jgo).
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Merrick Garland;, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Carlos Armando Ramirez..(Mills, Thomas) Modified on 10/14/2021 (jgo).
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: In light of the COVID-19 situation, the Court will conduct the Initial Pretrial Conference (IPTC) in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on December 17, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888-363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 8245. Initial Conference set for 12/17/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/13/2021) (tg)
October 13, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Thomas Joseph Mills to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant party name error listed on Summons and Summons caption. Party names must match pleading caption. Each Summons request is filed as its own separate event. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
October 13, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Thomas Joseph Mills to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; Defendant listed does not correspond to pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
October 12, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Thomas J. Mills to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 11, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Damian Williams, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Carlos Armando Ramirez..(Mills, Thomas) Modified on 10/13/2021 (vf).
October 11, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Merrick Garland; Alejandro Mayorkas; Ur Mendoza Jaddou; Timothy J. Houghton; Susan Quintana, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Carlos Armando Ramirez..(Mills, Thomas) Modified on 10/13/2021 (vf).
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Thomas J. Mills to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Carlos Armando Ramirez..(Mills, Thomas)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mills, Thomas)
October 7, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas Joseph Mills. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Merrick Garland,Alejandro Mayorkas,Ur Mendoza Jaddou,Timothy J Houghton,SUSAN QUINTANA. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; party name entered in all caps. (vf)
October 7, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear . MOTION for Thomas J. Mills to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25159634. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Affidavit is not notarized. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
October 7, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Thomas Joseph Mills. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
October 7, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
October 7, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
October 7, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thomas Joseph Mills. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 1 (U.S. Government Plaintiff); Cause of Action code 8:1446 Petition for Naturalization Hearing; Nature of Suit code 465 (Other Immigration Actions); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 2 (U.S. Government Defendant); the Cause of Action code has been modified to 08:1447 Immigration: Review of Denial of Naturalization Application; the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 462 (Naturalization Application); the County code has been modified to Bronx. (vf)
October 7, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Thomas J. Mills to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25159634. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., MOTION for Leave to Appear . Document filed by Carlos Armando Ramirez..(Mills, Thomas)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION Naturalization. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25158627).Document filed by Carlos Armando Ramirez..(Mills, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Garland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Armando Ramirez
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, USCIS Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J Houghton
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Directo SUSAN QUINTANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Quintana
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?