Gramercy Advisors LLC et al v. Khan
Plaintiff: Gramercy Advisors LLC, Gramercy Asset Management LLC, Gramercy Financial Services LLC and Tall Ships Capital Management LLC
Defendant: Shahid R Khan
Case Number: 1:2021cv08302
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #15 Motion for Wilson E. Wray to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/26/2021) (ks)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #14 Motion for W. Ralph Canada, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/26/2021) (ks)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #20 Motion for Matthew Ray to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys.. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/22/2021) (kv)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #19 Motion for David R. Deary to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys.. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/22/2021) (kv)
October 20, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for David R. Deary to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendant Shahid Khan. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25214705. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 19, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Matthew Ray to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendant Shahid Khan. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25214896. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Shahid R Khan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Ray, Matthew)
October 19, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for David R. Deary to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendant Shahid Khan. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25214705. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Shahid R Khan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Deary, David)
October 18, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Wilson E. Wray to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendant Shahid Khan. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25200576. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
October 18, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for W. Ralph Canada, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendant Shahid Khan. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25200042. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.>. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
October 15, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin A. Taylor on behalf of Shahid R Khan..(Taylor, Benjamin)
October 15, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Mead Cherington on behalf of Shahid R Khan..(Cherington, Rachel)
October 15, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory P. Joseph on behalf of Shahid R Khan..(Joseph, Gregory)
October 15, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Wilson E. Wray to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendant Shahid Khan. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25200576. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Shahid R Khan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Wray, Wilson)
October 15, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for W. Ralph Canada, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendant Shahid Khan. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25200042. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Shahid R Khan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Canada, William)
October 15, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donna Lee on behalf of Shahid R Khan..(Lee, Donna)
October 14, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Shahid R Khan waiver sent on 10/11/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. Document filed by Tall Ships Capital Management LLC; Gramercy Advisors LLC; Gramercy Financial Services LLC; Gramercy Asset Management LLC..(Petrella, Michael)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/6/2022 at 10:45 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe by telephone. The parties are directed to dial 888-363-4749 to participate, and to enter the access code 6212642. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/11/2021) (ks)
October 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Edward Petrella on behalf of Gramercy Advisors LLC, Gramercy Asset Management LLC, Gramercy Financial Services LLC, Tall Ships Capital Management LLC..(Petrella, Michael)
October 8, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shahid R Khan. (vf)
October 8, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
October 8, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
October 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Sean F. O'Shea. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand Blank. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 75,000. (vf)
October 8, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Tall Ships Capital Management LLC..(O'Shea, Sean)
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Gramercy Financial Services LLC..(O'Shea, Sean)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Gramercy Asset Management LLC..(O'Shea, Sean)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Gramercy Advisors LLC..(O'Shea, Sean)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Sean F. O'Shea re: that this action be filed as related to 1:13-CV-09069. Document filed by Gramercy Advisors LLC, Gramercy Asset Management LLC, Gramercy Financial Services LLC, Tall Ships Capital Management LLC..(O'Shea, Sean)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shahid R Khan, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Gramercy Advisors LLC, Gramercy Asset Management LLC, Gramercy Financial Services LLC, Tall Ships Capital Management LLC..(O'Shea, Sean)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Shea, Sean)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shahid R Khan. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25167648)Document filed by Tall Ships Capital Management LLC, Gramercy Advisors LLC, Gramercy Financial Services LLC, Gramercy Asset Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2001 Investment Management Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2001 Belief Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2003 Investment Management Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2003 Belief Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - Complaint in Case No. 09-L-0140, #6 Exhibit 6 - Complaint in Case No. 09-L-0139).(O'Shea, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gramercy Advisors LLC et al v. Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gramercy Advisors LLC
Represented By: Sean F. O'Shea
Represented By: Michael Edward Petrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gramercy Asset Management LLC
Represented By: Sean F. O'Shea
Represented By: Michael Edward Petrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gramercy Financial Services LLC
Represented By: Sean F. O'Shea
Represented By: Michael Edward Petrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tall Ships Capital Management LLC
Represented By: Sean F. O'Shea
Represented By: Michael Edward Petrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shahid R Khan
Represented By: David R. Deary
Represented By: Gregory P. Joseph
Represented By: Matthew Ray
Represented By: William Ralph Canada, Jr
Represented By: Benjamin A. Taylor
Represented By: Donna Lee
Represented By: Rachel Mead Cherington
Represented By: Wilson Edward Wray, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?