Bablu v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Ali Imam Bablu and Aliimam Bablu
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas, Director, USCIS Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas and Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Case Number: 1:2021cv08359
Filed: October 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, that this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs or fees to any party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/8/2021) (kv)
November 7, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Byars, Michael)
October 21, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Byars, Michael)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/18/2021) (kv)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/18/2021) (kv)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by December 9, 2021, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/18/2021) (kv)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou. (vf)
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alejandro Mayorkas. (vf)
October 12, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
October 12, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
October 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Rodkin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ali Imam Bablu. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (vf)
October 12, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
October 10, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Ali Imam Bablu..(Rodkin, David)
October 10, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mayorkas, Alejandro, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Ali Imam Bablu..(Rodkin, David)
October 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rodkin, David)
October 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25175747).Document filed by Ali Imam Bablu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit).(Rodkin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bablu v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Imam Bablu
Represented By: David Rodkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aliimam Bablu
Represented By: David Rodkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, USCIS Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?