Khan v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Mahmudul Hoque Khan and Mahmudul Hoque Khan
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas, District Director Thomas Cioppa, Director U.S.C.I.S Ur M. Jaddou, US AG Merrick Brian Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Thomas Cioppa, Ur M. Jaddou and Merrick Brian Garland
Case Number: 1:2021cv08376
Filed: October 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for December 3, 2021 is hereby adjourned to January 14, 2022 at 3:30 p.m. The parties' joint letter and proposed case management plan shall be filed no later than January 7, 2022. The parties shall use the dial-in information provided below to call into the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 1/14/2022 at 03:30 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/29/2021) (vfr)
November 24, 2021 Filing 7 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference presently scheduled for December 3, 2021 addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from AUSA Michael J. Byars dated November 24, 2021. Document filed by Thomas Cioppa, Merrick Brian Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Byars, Michael)
October 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of Thomas Cioppa, Merrick Brian Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Byars, Michael)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for a telephonic initial status conference on December 3, 2021 at 11:45 a.m. The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. If it is not feasible for the parties to appear telephonically at that time, they should jointly notify the Court as soon as possible by letter filed on ECF and include proposed alternative dates for this conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, one week prior to the initial conference, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the information listed in this Order in separate paragraphs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by one week prior to conference, the parties jointly submit to the Court a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. A template for the order is available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-ronnie-abrams. The status letter and the proposed case management plan should be filed electronically on ECF, consistent with the Court's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) Rules & Instructions, which were updated on February 1, 2019, and are available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. Please consult my Individual Rules and Practices with respect to communications with Chambers and related matters. Plaintiff is ordered to serve Defendants with a copy of this order and to file an affidavit on ECF certifying that such service has been effectuated. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 12/3/2021 at 11:45 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/15/2021) (ate)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thomas Cioppa, Merrick Brian Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. (vf)
October 12, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
October 12, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
October 12, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
October 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Patrick Caston Crowley. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Thomas Cioppa, Merrick Brian Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
October 11, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Mayorkas,Thomas Cioppa,Ur M. Jaddou,Merrick Brian Garland, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Mahmudul Hoque Khan..(Crowley, Patrick)
October 11, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Crowley, Patrick)
October 11, 2021 Filing 1 FIRST COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Thomas Cioppa, Merrick Brian Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25177160).Document filed by Mahmudul Hoque Khan..(Crowley, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Mahmudul Hoque Khan
Represented By: Patrick Caston Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahmudul Hoque Khan
Represented By: Patrick Caston Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director Thomas Cioppa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director U.S.C.I.S Ur M. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US AG Merrick Brian Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Cioppa
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Brian Garland
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?