Munjal v. Emirates
Plaintiff: Rajeev Munjal
Defendant: Emirates
Case Number: 1:2021cv08401
Filed: October 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 ac
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Granted. Plaintiff's opposition is due December 20, 2021. Defendant's reply, if any, will be due following the New Year holiday, on January 5, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/1/2021) (va)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from David N. Mair dated December 1, 2021. Document filed by Rajeev Munjal..(Mair, David)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 12/20/2021. Replies due by 1/5/2022. (va)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from John J. Porta dated 11/30/2021 re: Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Emirates..(Porta, John)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/17/2021. (ajs)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to contact the Magistrate Judge's chambers to schedule a settlement conference on a mutually agreeable date at such time that the parties agree a conference would be useful. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/17/2021) (va)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before aMagistrate Judge, including motions and trial. This case is not to be tried to a jury. Fact Discovery due by 4/18/2022. Deposition due by 4/18/2022. Expert Discovery due by 6/2/2022. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 2-4 days. Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/17/2021) (va)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Emirates..(Porta, John)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from John J. Porta dated November 10, 2021 re: Initial Conference on November 17, 2021 and Parties' Position. Document filed by Emirates..(Porta, John)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Emirates.Document filed by Rajeev Munjal..(Mair, David)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The initial pretrial conference in this case was scheduled for November 12, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. Due to a scheduling conflict, the conference is hereby adjourned until November 17, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. Counsel are reminded that the civil case management plan and scheduling order and joint letter are due four business days before the conference date. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 11/17/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/2/2021) (tg)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from John J. Porta dated 10/27/2021 re: Removal. Document filed by Emirates..(Porta, John)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff shall file any amended complaint by November 9, 2021. No further opportunities to amend will ordinarily be granted. If plaintiff does amend, by November 30, 2021, defendant shall: (1) file an answer; (2) file a new motion to dismiss; or (3) submit a letter to the Court, copying plaintiff, stating that they rely on the previously filed motion to dismiss. It is further ORDERED that if no amended complaint is filed, plaintiff shall serve any opposition to the motion to dismiss by November 9, 2021. Defendant's reply, if any, shall be served by November 23, 2021. At the time any reply is served, the moving party shall supply the Court with a courtesy copy of all motion papers by attaching them as PDF files to a single email addressed to EngelmayerNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. The Court will determine later, after receipt of plaintiffs anticipated brief opposing a motion to dismiss the current or amended complaint, whether to schedule oral argument. So Ordered (Amended Pleadings due by 11/9/2021.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/20/2021) (js)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Norton Mair on behalf of Rajeev Munjal..(Mair, David)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Emirates..(Porta, John)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Investment Corporation of Dubai for Emirates. Document filed by Emirates..(Porta, John)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIRMATION of John J. Porta in Support re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) AND TO STRIKE THE JURY DEMAND PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 39(a)(2).. Document filed by Emirates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Porta, John)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) AND TO STRIKE THE JURY DEMAND PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 39(a)(2). . Document filed by Emirates..(Porta, John)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) AND TO STRIKE THE JURY DEMAND PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 39(a)(2). Document filed by Emirates..(Porta, John)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: An initial pretrial conference is hereby scheduled for November 12, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. This conference will be held telephonically. The parties should call into the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749, and enter Access Code 468-4906, followed by the pound(#) key. Counsel are directed to review the Court's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in Light of COVID-19, found at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-paul-engelmayer, for the Court's procedures for telephonic conferences and for instructions for communicating with chambers. By the date of the initial pretrial conference, counsel for all parties are required to register as filing users in accordance with the Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 11/12/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/13/2021) (ama)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Joseph Porta. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory S Slotnick on behalf of Emirates..(Slotnick, Gregory)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Joseph Porta on behalf of Emirates..(Porta, John)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Porta, John)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 156264/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25182013).Document filed by Emirates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - New York State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - NYS Court Affidavit of Service on NY Secretary of State, #3 Exhibit C - Pages From Emirates 2019-2020 Annual Report).(Porta, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munjal v. Emirates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rajeev Munjal
Represented By: David Norton Mair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emirates
Represented By: Gregory S Slotnick
Represented By: John Joseph Porta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?