Aal v. D&A Contracting, LLC
Plaintiff: JILL AAL
Defendant: D&A CONTRACTING, LLC.,, THOMAS A. MICHETTI, 3RD and D&A Contracting, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv08512
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 au
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, in light of the public health crisis, the Court will not be holding an initial pretrial conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by December 14, 2021, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 11/30/2021) (kv)
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by D&A Contracting, LLC, Thomas A. Michetti, 3rd..(Skelly, James)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by D&A Contracting, LLC, Thomas A. Michetti, 3rd..(Skelly, James)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by D&A Contracting, LLC, Thomas A. Michetti, 3rd. It is hereby: ORDERED that Defendants are directed to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before November 29, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 11/18/2021) (kv)
October 19, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so redesignated. (vba)
October 19, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Vincent L. Briccetti is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
October 18, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
October 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney James Michael Skelly. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: JILL AAL, THOMAS A. MICHETTI, 3RD, D&A CONTRACTING, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly. (vf)
October 18, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
October 18, 2021 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
October 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Skelly, James)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 158388/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25200740).Document filed by THOMAS A. MICHETTI, 3RD, D&A CONTRACTING, LLC.,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit statement of grounds of removal, #2 Exhibit original summons and complaint).(Skelly, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aal v. D&A Contracting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JILL AAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&A CONTRACTING, LLC.,
Represented By: James Michael Skelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS A. MICHETTI, 3RD
Represented By: James Michael Skelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&A Contracting, LLC
Represented By: James Michael Skelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?