Eric & Co Trading Group LLC v. Mayweather
Plaintiff: ERIC & CO TRADING GROUP LLC
Defendant: FLOYD JOY MAYWEATHER and Floyd Joy Mayweather Jr.
Case Number: 1:2021cv08580
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Floyd Joy Mayweather Jr. . Document filed by Eric & Co Trading Group LLC..(Dayan, Albert)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any motion for entry of a default judgment shall be filed by January 10, 2022. Plaintiff is directed to follow the procedures applicable to default judgments under the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, available at the Court's website. Failure to move for a default judgment by January 10, 2022 may result in dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute, pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See LeSane v. Hall's Sec. Analyst, Inc., 239 F.3d 206, 209 (2d Cir. 2001). SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 1/10/2022.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 12/3/2021) (vfr)
November 15, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons in a Civil Action, Amended Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet served on Floyd Joy Mayweather on 11/06/2021. Service was accepted by Female would not give her name.. Document filed by Eric & Co Trading Group LLC..(Dayan, Albert)
November 1, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #3 Complaint against Floyd Joy Mayweather Jr. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Eric & Co Trading Group LLC. Related document: #3 Complaint..(Dayan, Albert)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #8 Letter, filed by Eric & Co Trading Group LLC. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. Plaintiff is directed to file its Amended Complaint on or before November 5, 2021. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 11/5/2021.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 11/1/2021) (tg)
October 29, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Albert Y. Dayan re: response to Judge's Order and request permission to file Amended Complaint. Document filed by Eric & Co Trading Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint).(Dayan, Albert)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: This action was filed on October 25, 2021 [ECF No. 1]. Plaintiff claims subject matter jurisdiction is proper under 28 U.S.C. 1332. The Complaint, however, does not state the citizenship of the members of the Plaintiff LLC. Compl. 45. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs are directed to show cause by November 1, 2021 why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See Flemming v. Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, No. 21 Civ. 1112, 2021 WL 878558, at *1-2 (E.D.N.Y. Mar. 9, 2021). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 10/25/2021) (tg)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Floyd Joy Mayweather Jr.. (vf)
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dayan, Albert)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Floyd Joy Mayweather Jr., re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Eric & Co Trading Group LLC..(Dayan, Albert)
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Floyd Joy Mayweather Jr.. Document filed by Eric & Co Trading Group LLC..(Dayan, Albert)
October 25, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
October 25, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
October 25, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
October 25, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Albert Yukhanan Dayan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:294 Breach of Contract; Nature of Suit code 150 (Contract: Recovery/Enforcement); Class Action code n (No Class Action Alleged). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract; the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 190 (Contract: Other); the Class Action code has been modified to y (Class Action Alleged). (vf)
October 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Albert Yukhanan Dayan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: FLOYD JOY MAYWEATHER, ERIC & CO TRADING GROUP LLC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
October 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Albert Yukhanan Dayan. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
October 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Albert Yukhanan Dayan to Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. Summons form; the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons. Summons must be linked to correctly filed Complaint. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
October 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Albert Yukhanan Dayan to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Notice (Other), #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the wrong event type was used to file the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 10/25/2021. (vf)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Complaint. Document filed by ERIC & CO TRADING GROUP LLC..(Dayan, Albert) Modified on 10/20/2021 (vf).
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against FLOYD JOY MAYWEATHER. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25216708)Document filed by ERIC & CO TRADING GROUP LLC..(Dayan, Albert) Modified on 10/20/2021 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eric & Co Trading Group LLC v. Mayweather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC & CO TRADING GROUP LLC
Represented By: Albert Yukhanan Dayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOYD JOY MAYWEATHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyd Joy Mayweather Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?