Goodman v. Federal Bureau Of Investigation
Plaintiff: Ryan Goodman, as Co-Editor-in-Chief of Just Security and Ryan Goodman
Defendant: Federal Bureau Of Investigation
Case Number: 1:2021cv08588
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #9 Letter filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation. ENDORSEMENT: There appears to be a typographical error in the letter, so the joint status update is due on or before February 3, 2022. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/6/2021) (vfr)
December 3, 2021 Filing 9 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Michael Linhorst and Natasha W. Teleanu dated December 3, 2021 re: submission in lieu of initial conference. Document filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Teleanu, Natasha)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, in light of the public health crisis, the Court will not be holding an initial pretrial conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by December 3, 2021, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 11/22/2021) (kv)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Teleanu, Natasha)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Waglow Teleanu on behalf of Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Teleanu, Natasha)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). Federal Bureau Of Investigation served on 10/20/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Ryan Goodman..(Linhorst, Michael)
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(jgo)
October 20, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Linhorst. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ryan Goodman, as Co-Editor-in-Chief of Just Security. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was modified to add party text separately. (jgo)
October 20, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
October 20, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ryan Goodman, as Co-Editor-in-Chief of Just Security..(Linhorst, Michael)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Linhorst, Michael)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau Of Investigation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25217590)Document filed by Ryan Goodman, as Co-Editor-in-Chief of Just Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Linhorst, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodman v. Federal Bureau Of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Goodman, as Co-Editor-in-Chief of Just Security
Represented By: Michael Linhorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Goodman
Represented By: Michael Linhorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau Of Investigation
Represented By: Natasha Waglow Teleanu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?