Geographic Location Innovations LLC v. New Deal LLC
Plaintiff: Geographic Location Innovations LLC
Defendant: New Deal, LLC d/b/a Against All Odds and New Deal LLC doing business as Against All Odds
Case Number: 1:2021cv08605
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #19 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint or Otherwise Move addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Meichelle R. MacGregor dated December 14, 2021. The time to answer is extended to 1/12/22. The request to adjourn the conference is denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/15/2021) (vfr)
December 15, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: New Deal LLC answer due 1/12/2022. (vfr)
December 14, 2021 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint or Otherwise Move addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Meichelle R. MacGregor dated December 14, 2021. Document filed by New Deal LLC..(MacGregor, Meichelle)
December 14, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Andrew Berman on behalf of New Deal LLC..(Berman, Jeremy)
December 14, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Meichelle Rose MacGregor on behalf of New Deal LLC..(MacGregor, Meichelle)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting in part in part #15 Letter Motion to Continue; terminating #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. The conference is adjourned to 1/13/22 at 2:00 p.m. Initial Conference set for 1/13/2022 at 2:00 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/2/2021) (vfr)
December 2, 2021 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File detailed written proposed schedule addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Jay Johnson dated December 2, 2021., LETTER MOTION to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Jay Johnson dated December 2, 2021. Document filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting in part #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Jay Johnson dated November 23, 2021. The Defendant shall file a responsive pleading by December 17, 2021. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/24/2021) (vfr)
November 24, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: New Deal LLC answer due 12/17/2021. (vfr)
November 23, 2021 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Jay Johnson dated November 23, 2021. Document filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
November 12, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. New Deal LLC served on 11/8/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. Service was accepted by PK Koo, Controller. Document filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference by telephone set for 12/21/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote. The parties shall use the following dial-in credentials for the conference. Dial-in: 888-363-4749 Access code: 4324948. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/28/2021) (vfr)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Jay Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (jwh)
October 27, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
October 22, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
October 22, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Philip M. Halpern is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
October 21, 2021 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management, LLC for Geographic Location Innovations LLC. Document filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
October 21, 2021 Filing 8 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(jgo)
October 21, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New Deal LLC..(jgo)
October 21, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jay B. Johnson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: New Deal, LLC d/b/a Against All Odds. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was modified to add alias separately. (jgo)
October 21, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Jay Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25223712. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 21, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
October 21, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jay B. Johnson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
October 21, 2021 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
October 21, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 20, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Jay Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25223712. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Johnson, Jay)
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC..(Johnson, Jay) Modified on 10/20/2021 (ldi).
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Johnson, Jay)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New Deal, LLC d/b/a Against All Odds, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Johnson, Jay)
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New Deal, LLC d/b/a Against All Odds. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25221585)Document filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Johnson, Jay)
October 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jay B. Johnson to RE-FILE Document #5 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (ldi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geographic Location Innovations LLC v. New Deal LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geographic Location Innovations LLC
Represented By: Jay B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Deal, LLC d/b/a Against All Odds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Deal LLC doing business as Against All Odds
Represented By: Meichelle Rose MacGregor
Represented By: Jeremy Andrew Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?