Wang v. Mayorkas et al
Petitioner: Weihua Wang
Respondent: Alejandro Mayorkas, Director, USCIS Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Director Tim Houghton, Ur Mendoza Jaddou and Tim Houghton
Case Number: 1:2021cv08656
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Tim Houghton, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Byars, Michael)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of Tim Houghton, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Byars, Michael)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tim Houghton, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas..(jgo)
October 29, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Tim Houghton, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Weihua Wang..(Li, Zhen)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendants shall, by December 21, 2021, e-mail a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/node/754 and attached to this order, to Orders_and_Judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by December 20, 2021, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party and parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/25/2021) (ate)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/25/2021) (kv)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by December 21, 2021, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/25/2021) (kv)
October 22, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Zhen Liang Li. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Tim Houghton, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
October 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Zhen Liang Li. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
October 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Zhen Liang Li. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (pc)
October 22, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
October 22, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Tim Houghton, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25229807).Document filed by Weihua Wang..(Li, Zhen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Weihua Wang
Represented By: Zhen Liang Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, USCIS Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director Tim Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tim Houghton
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?