Continental Plants Group, LLC v. Alpha International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Continental Plants Group, LLC
Defendant: Alpha International, Inc., J. Lloyd International, Inc., J. K. Manufacturing Co. and J. K. Properties LC
Case Number: 1:2021cv08677
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Alpha International, Inc., J. K. Manufacturing Co., J. K. Properties LC, J. Lloyd International, Inc.. Related Document Number: #10 ..(Gainer, Robert) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
November 15, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Robert C. Gainer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25336255. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alpha International, Inc., J. K. Manufacturing Co., J. K. Properties LC, J. Lloyd International, Inc...(Gainer, Robert)
November 12, 2021 Filing 9 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: The case is not to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 12/1/2021. Motions due by 3/15/2022. Responses due by 3/29/2022 Replies due by 4/5/2022. Deposition due by 4/1/2022. Discovery due by 3/1/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Ready for Trial by 4/12/2022. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/12/2021) (kv)
November 12, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/12/2021, ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda)
November 12, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: ( Initial Telephonic Conference set for 11/12/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.)The dial in information remains 888-363-4735 USA toll free,215-446-3657 international caller paid, access code 1086415.. (Kotowski, Linda)
October 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 11-12-2021, ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE AT 11:30 am. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. Initial Conference set for 11/12/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/28/2021) (kv)
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Alpha International, Inc. served on 10/26/2021, answer due 11/16/2021; J. K. Manufacturing Co. served on 10/26/2021, answer due 11/16/2021; J. K. Properties LC served on 10/26/2021, answer due 11/16/2021; J. Lloyd International, Inc. served on 10/26/2021, answer due 11/16/2021. Service was accepted by Jody Keener. Document filed by Continental Plants Group, LLC..(Mazur, Zachary)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mazur, Zachary)
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alpha International, Inc., J. K. Manufacturing Co., J. K. Properties LC, J. Lloyd International, Inc.. (sj)
October 25, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
October 25, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Zachary Evan Mazur. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1,085,000. (sj)
October 25, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
October 25, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Zachary Evan Mazur to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (sj)
October 25, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
October 24, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alpha International, Inc., J. Lloyd International, Inc., J. K. Manufacturing Co., and J. K. Properties, LC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Continental Plants Group, LLC..(Mazur, Zachary)
October 22, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Continental Plants Group, LLC..(Mazur, Zachary)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET PLEADING - PDF ERROR CIVIL COVER SHEET filed.(Mazur, Zachary) Modified on 10/25/2021 (sj).
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alpha International, Inc., J. K. Manufacturing Co., J. K. Properties LC, J. Lloyd International, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25232582)Document filed by Continental Plants Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement).(Mazur, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Plants Group, LLC v. Alpha International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Plants Group, LLC
Represented By: Zachary Evan Mazur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha International, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Gainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lloyd International, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Gainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. K. Manufacturing Co.
Represented By: Robert Gainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. K. Properties LC
Represented By: Robert Gainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?