In Re: Salvador Diaz
Petitioner: Salvador Diaz
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv08687
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651 mn
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) USCA Case Number 21-2787. Petitioner, pro se, requests the above-captioned petition for a writ of mandamus be withdrawn, as it is duplicative of his petition under docket no. 21-2614. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the request is GRANTED and the petition is deemed WITHDRAWN.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 11/18/2021..(nd)
October 27, 2021 Non-Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Non-Appeal Electronic Files for #3 Transfer Order U.S.C.A., were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
October 27, 2021 Mailed a copy of #3 Transfer Order U.S.C.A. to Salvador Diaz at P.O. Box 151, Horntown, VA 23395. (kh)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER: In the interest of justice, the Court directs the Clerk of Court to transfer this action to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit. See 28 U.S.C. 1631. This order supersedes the provision of Local Civil Rule 83.1 that requires a seven-day delay before the Clerk of Court may effectuate the transfer of this action to the transferee court. This order closes this action in this court. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Court also directs the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this court to Petitioner and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/26/2021) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 26, 2021 Transmission to Appeals Clerk. Transmitted re: #3 Transfer Order U.S.C.A. to the Appeals Clerk for case processing. (sac)
October 26, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: WHEREAS on October 21, 2021, Mr. Diaz filed a petition for a writ of mandamus, see 17-CR-227, Dkt. 183; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to open a new civil case for Mr. Diazs mandamus petition. The document at 17-CR-227, Dkt. 183 should be docketed as docket entry 1 in the new civil case. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this order to Mr. Diaz. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/22/21) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against United States of America.Document filed by Salvador Diaz.(rdz) Modified on 10/22/2021 (rdz).
October 21, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Salvador Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Salvador Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?