Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. ARS Office Furniture Installers Inc.
Petitioner: Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds, Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York and New York City District Council of Carpenters
Respondent: ARS Office Furniture Installers Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv08779
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order issued by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on December 6, 2021 served on ARS Office Furniture Installers Inc. on December 6, 2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
December 6, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Nicole Marimon, Esq. dated December 6, 2021 re: withdrawing the application to deem the petition unopposed. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
December 6, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Nicole Marimon, Esq. dated December 6, 2021 re: request to have petition be deemed as an unopposed motion for summary judgment. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Respondent shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the Petition to Confirm Arbitration on or before December 29, 2021. Failure to do so may result in the Court considering Petitioners' Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award unopposed. Petitioners are directed to serve this order on Respondent and file proof of service on the docket on or before December 15, 2021. SO ORDERED. ARS Office Furniture Installers Inc. answer due 12/29/2021.( Service due by 12/15/2021.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 12/6/2021) (tg)
November 1, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,, served. ARS Office Furniture Installers Inc. served on 10/29/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch, an authorized person in the corporation division of the department of state. Document filed by Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund; New York City District Council of Carpenters; Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds..(Marimon, Nicole)
October 28, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ARS Office Furniture Installers Inc...(jgo)
October 28, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 28, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
October 28, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
October 27, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,, . Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
October 27, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ARS Office Furniture Installers Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,,. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
October 27, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Marimon, Nicole)
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25251073).Document filed by Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds. (Attachments: #1 Independent Building Construction 2011-2015, #2 Signature and administration pages, #3 Extension and compliance agreement, #4 Independent Building Construction 2017 - 2024, #5 January 2016 Revised Collection Policy, #6 May 14, 2021 Notice of Hearing, #7 August 6, 2021 Arbitration Award, #8 History Bill for the Court, #9 Proposed Judgment).(Marimon, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. ARS Office Furniture Installers Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: New York City District Council of Carpenters
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ARS Office Furniture Installers Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?