Meratas Inc. v. Herrick
Plaintiff: MERATAS INC.
Defendant: martin herrick
Case Number: 1:2021cv08867
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 203
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Martin Herrick. Document filed by Meratas Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Davidoff, Jonathan)
November 4, 2021 Filing 10 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from jonathan davidoff dated 11/4/2021 re: venue. Document filed by Meratas Inc...(Davidoff, Jonathan)
November 4, 2021 Filing 9 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Meratas Inc...(Davidoff, Jonathan)
November 4, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
November 4, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Judge Vincent L. Briccetti is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
November 3, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - PDF ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jonathan Marc Davidoff to RE-FILE Document #5 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (The PDF is not Signed) (lb)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Under Rule 18 of the SDNY Rules for the Division of Business Among District Judges, a civil case must be designated for assignment to the White Plains courthouse if: i. The claim arose in whole or in major part in the Counties of Dutchess, Orange, Putnam, Rockland, Sullivan, or Westchester (the "Northern Counties") and at least one of the parties resides in the Northern Counties; or ii. The claim arose in whole or in major part in the Northern Counties and none of the parties resides in this District. A civil case may also be designated for assignment to White Plains if: iii. The claim arose outside this district and at least some of the parties reside in the Northern Counties; or iv. At least half of the parties reside in the Northern Counties. Here, plaintiff alleges no facts indicating the claims asserted arose in whole or in major part in the Northern Counties, or that any party resides in the Northern Counties. Indeed, according to the complaint, plaintiff is located in Connecticut and defendant resides in California. Therefore, it does not appear this case was properly designated to White Plains. Accordingly, by November 9, 2021, plaintiffs counsel shall submit a letter explaining in detail why the case is properly designated for assignment to the White Plains courthouse under Rule 18 or acknowledging that it should be reassigned to the Manhattan courthouse. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 11/2/2021) (tg) Modified on 11/2/2021 (tg).
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Martin Herrick..(jgo)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Martin Herrick, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Meratas Inc...(Davidoff, Jonathan)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Meratas Inc...(Davidoff, Jonathan) Modified on 11/3/2021 (lb).
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Martin Herrick. Document filed by Meratas Inc...(Davidoff, Jonathan)
November 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
November 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jonathan Marc Davidoff. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Meratas Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (sj)
November 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jonathan Marc Davidoff to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
November 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jonathan Marc Davidoff to RE-FILE Document #2 Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
November 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jonathan Marc Davidoff. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 1 (Citizen of This State); Dollar Demand $75,000,000; County code Westchester. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $75,000; the County code has been modified to New York. (sj)
November 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jonathan Marc Davidoff to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. Summons form; Incorrect party as to whom the summons request is for was selected. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MERATAS INC., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by MERATAS INC...(Davidoff, Jonathan)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement rule 7.1 disclosure).(Davidoff, Jonathan)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25263274)Document filed by MERATAS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Exhibit b, #3 Exhibit c, #4 Exhibit d, #5 Exhibit e, #6 Exhibit f, #7 Exhibit g, #8 Exhibit h, #9 Exhibit i).(Davidoff, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meratas Inc. v. Herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERATAS INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Davidoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: martin herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?