Balkum v. Clemens et al
Plaintiff: Francis Balkum and Francis J. Balkum III
Defendant: Alan Clemens and The Clemens Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv08933
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Alan Clemens served on 12/21/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. Service was accepted by Mathew - Concierge. Document filed by Francis J. Balkum III..(Kolcun, Michael)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: In light of the COVID-19 situation, the Court will conduct the Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on January 14, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888-363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 8933. Counsel should submit their proposed case management plan and joint letter as outlined below. In their joint letter, the parties should indicate whether they believe a Rule 16 conference is unnecessary and ask that their proposed Case Management Plan simply be so ordered; or whether they believe a conference would be helpful and have no objection to proceeding by teleconference; or whether they believe a conference would be helpful and request it be adjourned until such time as it can be safely held in person. If the parties prefer an in-person conference, they should propose three mutually-agreed upon Fridays for the conference, although the Court does not guarantee it will honor the parties' preferred date. The parties are directed to submit a joint letter of no more than five pages by January 6, 2022, addressing the following in separate paragraphs: (1) a brief description of the case, including the factual and legal bases for the claim(s) and defense(s); (2) any contemplated motions; (3) the basis for subject matter jurisdiction; and (4) the prospect for settlement. Plaintiff's counsel, or the defendant's counsel in removed cases, is responsible for distributing copies of this Notice to all parties. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 1/14/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/11/21) (yv)
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Clemens Group, Inc.. (sj)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alan Clemens..(sj)
November 2, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 2, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 2, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
November 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Anthony Kolcun, Jr.. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Francis J. Balkum III. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (sj)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Clemens Group, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Francis Balkum..(Kolcun, Michael)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alan Clemens, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Francis Balkum..(Kolcun, Michael)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kolcun, Michael)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alan Clemens, The Clemens Group, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25271164)Document filed by Francis Balkum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement, #2 Exhibit Termination Letter).(Kolcun, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balkum v. Clemens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Balkum
Represented By: Michael Anthony Kolcun, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis J. Balkum III
Represented By: Michael Anthony Kolcun, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Clemens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Clemens Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?