PayVicki LLC v. Payvision US Inc. et al
Plaintiff: PayVicki LLC
Defendant: Payvision US Inc. and Ing Groep N.V.
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Payvision B.V. and Acapture APAC Limited
Case Number: 1:2021cv08939
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 ds
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Payvision US Inc. served on 12/21/2021, answer due 1/17/2022. Service was accepted by Colleen Banahan, Authorized Agent, Secretary of State. Document filed by PayVicki LLC..(Kendall, Glen)
December 21, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Giorgio Sassine on behalf of Payvision US Inc...(Sassine, Giorgio)
December 21, 2021 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - SEE DOCUMENT #15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Giorgio Sassine on behalf of Payvision B.V...(Sassine, Giorgio) Modified on 12/22/2021 (lb).
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Payvision time to answer extended to January 17, 2022. Conference adjourned from January 11, 2022 to February 4, 2022 at 11:30 am telephonically. Call in 1-888-363-4749 Access code 3667981. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/16/2021) (js)
December 17, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Payvision US Inc. answer due 1/17/2022., Set/Reset Hearings:( Initial Conference set for 2/4/2022 at 11:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (js)
December 16, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jared R. Clark dated December 16, 2021. Document filed by Payvision US Inc...(Clark, Jared)
December 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jared Riley Clark on behalf of Payvision US Inc...(Clark, Jared)
December 14, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Payvision B.V...(gp)
December 14, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ing Groep N.V...(gp)
December 14, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ING Groep N.V., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by PayVicki LLC..(Kendall, Glen)
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Payvision B.V., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by PayVicki LLC..(Kendall, Glen)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF (OR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT) SHALL IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO ALL PARTIES. Counsel for all parties shall appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference, held pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, January 11, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. Principal trial shall appear at this and all subsequent conferences. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, conferences with the Court in civil cases will be held by teleconferencing until further notice. For initial pretrial conferences, plaintiff(s)' counsel shall, no later than 5 business days before the conference, email a copy of the agreed upon (or disputed)Civil Case Management Plan & Scheduling Order to: castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. The call-in information for all teleconferences is: Dial-in:(888) 363-4749; Access Code: 3667981. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 1/11/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/03/2021) (ama)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Payvision US Inc...(pc)
November 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Glen Alan Kendall. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Payvision B.V., Acapture APAC Limited. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
November 2, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 2, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 2, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by PayVicki LLC..(Kendall, Glen)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Payvision US Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by PayVicki LLC..(Kendall, Glen)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kendall, Glen)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Acapture APAC Limited, Ing Groep N.V., Payvision B.V., Payvision US Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25272321)Document filed by PayVicki LLC..(Kendall, Glen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PayVicki LLC v. Payvision US Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PayVicki LLC
Represented By: Glen Alan Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payvision US Inc.
Represented By: Jared Riley Clark
Represented By: Giorgio Sassine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ing Groep N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Payvision B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Acapture APAC Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?