Licensing Matters Global, Limited v. Buzzfeed, Inc.
Plaintiff: Licensing Matters Global, Limited
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Buzzfeed, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv08983
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Brian L. Wolensky dated November 30, 2021 re: Withdraw Document. Document filed by Licensing Matters Global, Limited..(Wolensky, Brian)
November 24, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Buzzfeed, Inc. waiver sent on 11/16/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. Document filed by Licensing Matters Global, Limited..(Wolensky, Brian)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian L Wolensky on behalf of Licensing Matters Global, Limited..(Wolensky, Brian)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Licensing Matters Global, Limited..(Leonard, Rebecca)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Buzzfeed, Inc. served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/1/2021. Service was accepted by Mara Velasco. Document filed by Licensing Matters Global, Limited..(Leonard, Rebecca)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Buzzfeed, Inc. (vf)
November 3, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 3, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 3, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Rebecca Elizabeth Leonard. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Buzzfeed, Inc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (vf)
November 3, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Rebecca Elizabeth Leonard. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S. (vf)
November 3, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BuzzFeed, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Licensing Matters Global, Limited..(Leonard, Rebecca)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Leonard, Rebecca)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25276499)Document filed by Licensing Matters Global, Limited..(Leonard, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Licensing Matters Global, Limited v. Buzzfeed, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Licensing Matters Global, Limited
Represented By: Rebecca Elizabeth Leonard
Represented By: Brian L Wolensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Buzzfeed, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?