Lee v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Nancy Lee
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv09057
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sarah Netburn
Referring Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Document filed by Nancy Lee. Electronic Certified Administrative Record due by 2/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 US Atty's office proof of service, #2 OGC proof of service, #3 US Atty Gen proof of service).(Pierre Pierre, Eddy)
November 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi..(Ramirez-Fisher, Leslie)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties should follow the schedule set forth in the Standing Order at ECF No. 5. Requests for extensions of the deadlines set by this scheduling order may be granted by the Court, but only if they are made in advance of the deadline, and there is good reason provided for the request. Such requests shall be submitted in accordance with the Individual Practices of Judge Netburn, available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Netburn, and as further set forth herein. The Clerk of Court is ordered to send this order to the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 11/10/2021) (ras) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Modified on 11/10/2021 (ras).
November 10, 2021 Mailed a copy of #9 Scheduling Order, to United States Attorneys Office, Southern District of NY, 86 Chambers Street, New York, NY 10007. (dsh)
November 9, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kilolo Kijakazi. (sj)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915., Motions terminated: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis . filed by Nancy Lee. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 11/8/2021) (tg)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Motions referred to Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 11/8/2021) (tg)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on April 20, 2016) (vf)
November 4, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 4, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 4, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis . Document filed by Nancy Lee..(Pierre Pierre, Eddy)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nancy Lee..(Pierre Pierre, Eddy)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pierre Pierre, Eddy)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi. Document filed by Nancy Lee..(Pierre Pierre, Eddy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Lee
Represented By: Eddy Pierre Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?