Stevez v. Ouachita Baptist University
Plaintiff: Arturo Stevez
Defendant: Ouachita Baptist University
Case Number: 1:2021cv09074
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement With Prejudice. Document filed by Arturo Stevez..(LaBollita, Michael)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ouachita Baptist University waiver sent on 11/16/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. Document filed by Arturo Stevez..(LaBollita, Michael)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ouachita Baptist University..(pc)
November 4, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 4, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 4, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb on behalf of Arturo Stevez..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(LaBollita, Michael)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ouachita Baptist University, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Arturo Stevez..(LaBollita, Michael)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ouachita Baptist University. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25284918)Document filed by Arturo Stevez..(LaBollita, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevez v. Ouachita Baptist University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Stevez
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb
Represented By: Michael A. LaBollita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ouachita Baptist University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?