Snowbridge Advisors LLC et al v. ESO Capital Partners UK LLP et al
Plaintiff: Snowbridge Advisors LLC and Snowbridge Securities LLC
Defendant: Soho Square Capital LLP, ESO Capital Partners UK LLP, ESO Capital Advisors LLP, Core Capital Partners LLP, Alexander Schmid, Walid Fakhry and Stephen Edwards
Case Number: 1:2021cv09086
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 3/21/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 3/21/2022 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sharonda Jones, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/5/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2022..(Moya, Goretti)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: #61 Order on Motion to Dismiss #62 Order in favor of ESO Capital Partners UK LLP, Soho Square Capital LLP against Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Order dated April 11, 2022, and the Courts Order dated March 28, 2022, the Court grants both motions and dismisses the complaint. The claims of plaintiff Snowbridge Advisors LLC for breach of contract against ESO Partners and for breach of contract against Soho Square as successor are dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The claims of plaintiff Snowbridge Securities LLC for breach of contract against ESO Partners and for breach of contract against Soho Square as successor are dismissed for lack of standing. The Court also grants the motions of ESO Partners and Soho Square to dismiss Count Six because the request for a declaratory judgment is duplicative of the breach of contract and breach of contract as successor claims in Counts One and Two, and it does not serve a useful purpose to clarify the legal issues involved or otherwise finalize the controversy or offer relief from uncertainty. Finally, plaintiffs' request for leave to replead is denied as futile; accordingly, the complaint is dismissed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 4/12/2022) (Attachments: #1 Right to Appeal) (km)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Terminate Transcript Deadlines (km)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM ORDER re: #61 Order on Motion to Dismiss. For the aforementioned reasons, and as the Court stated by bottom-line order dated March 28, 2022, see ECF No. 61, the Court grants the motions of ESO Partners and Soho Square and dismisses the complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment and close the entries at docket numbers 37 and 39. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/11/2022) (kv) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Dismiss; granting #47 Motion to Dismiss. Now before the Court are the motions of defendants ESO Capital Partners UK LLP ("ESO Partners") and Soho Square Capital LLP ("Soho Square") to dismiss plaintiffs' claims against them for lack of subject matter jurisdiction under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) (1) and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) (6). ECF Nos. 37 and 39. Upon due consideration, the Court grants both motions and dismisses the complaint. The claims of plaintiff Snowbridge Advisors LLC for breach of contract against ESO Partners and for breach of contract against Soho Square as successor are dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The claims of plaintiff Snowbridge Securities LLC for breach of contract against ESO Partners and for breach of contract against Soho Square as successor are dismissed for lack of standing. The Court also grants the motions of ESO Partners and Soho Square to dismiss Count Six because the request for a declaratory judgment is duplicative of the breach of contract and breach of contract as successor claims in Counts One and Two, and it does not serve a useful purpose to clarify the legal issues involved or otherwise finalize the controversy or offer relief from uncertainty. Finally, plaintiffs' request for leave to replead is denied as futile. The Court will issue an opinion setting forth the reasons for this ruling by no later than April 11, 2022, at which time final judgment will be entered. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/28/2022) (rro)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 DECLARATION of Randall L Rasey in Opposition re: #39 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(1)., #37 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H - Transcript, #2 Exhibit I - Black's Law Dictionary).(Rasey, Randall)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 DECLARATION of Mark Schroeder in Opposition re: #39 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(1)., #37 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G - Merger Agreement).(Rasey, Randall)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #39 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(1)., #37 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC..(Rasey, Randall)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephonic Oral Argument held on 3/22/2022 re: #47 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. filed by Alexander Schmid. (Kotowski, Linda)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 3/21/2022, ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.)The Court also grants the request for a 90-day extension to the close of discovery and other case management plan deadlines. The new deadlines are as follows: all discovery is to be completed by June 29, 2022. The summary judgment briefing schedule is as follows: moving papers must be served by July 5, 2022; opposing papers by July 21, 2022; and reply papers by August 1, 2022. The final pre-trial conference, previously scheduled for May 10, 2022 at 4:00 p.m., is hereby rescheduled for Tuesday, August 9, 2022 (08/09/2022) at 4:00 p.m. before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. The public may access this proceeding by dialing :USA toll free 888-363-4735, international caller paid 215-446-3657, Access code 1086415. (Kotowski, Linda)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: ( Telephonic Oral Argument set for 3/21/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. The dial in information remind the same. ). (Kotowski, Linda)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephonic Oral Argument set for 3/21/2022 at 04:30 PM before Judge Jed S.Rakoff.The public may access this proceeding by dialing :USA toll free 888-363-4735, international caller paid 215-446-3657, Access code 1086415. (Kotowski, Linda)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/9/2022) (kv)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC..(Rasey, Randall)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 OPINION AND ORDER re: #39 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(1). filed by Soho Square Capital LLP, Walid Fakhry, Stephen Edwards. For the foregoing reasons, the Court reaffirms its Order of March 3, 2022 that granted the 12 (b) (1) motion to dismiss the claims against Fakhry and Edwards for lack of personal jurisdiction; dismissed Counts Three and Five against Fakhry, Edwards, and Soho Square for failure to state a claim; and denied, Soho Square's motion to dismiss Count Two on either 12 (b) (2) or 12 (b) (6) grounds. The Clerk is directed to close the entry at docket number 26. SO ORDERED. Stephen Edwards and Walid Fakhry terminated. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/7/2022) (kv)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AGAINST DEFENDANT ALEXANDER SCHMID: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE, that pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(l (A)(i), no party having yet filed an answer or summary judgment motion in the above-captioned action, plaintiffs SNOWBRIDGE ADVISORS LLC and SNOWBRIDGE SECURITIES LLC hereby dismiss, without prejudice, their Complaint and claims for relief stated therein as against defendant ALEXANDER SCHMID. For the avoidance of doubt, plaintiffs do not intend by this Notice to dismiss any claim or portion of their Complaint except as against defendant Alexander Schmid. SO ORDERED. Alexander Schmid terminated. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/7/2022) (kv)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #53 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Jed S. Rakoff for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Alexander Schmid. Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Rasey, Randall)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #26 Motion to Dismiss. Now before the Court is the motion of defendants Soho Square Capital LLP ("Soho Square"), Walid Fakhry, and Stephen Edwards to dismiss plaintiffs' claims against them for lack of personal jurisdiction under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) (2) and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) (6). ECF No. 26. Upon due consideration, the Court grants in part and denies in part the motion of Soho Square, Fakhry, and Edwards to dismiss plaintiffs' claims against them. The Court grants the 12 (b) (2) motion to dismiss the claims against Fakhry and Edwards for lack of personal jurisdiction; even if personal jurisdiction were proper as to Fakhry and Edwards, the Court also grants the 12(b) (6) motion to dismiss Counts Three and Five against Fakhry, Edwards, and Soho Square for failure to state a claim. The Court denies, however, Soho Square's 12(b) (2) motion and its 12(b) (6) motion to dismiss Count Two. Further discovery on jurisdiction is denied as unnecessary. Plaintiffs' request for leave to amend their claims is also denied; having been specifically asked at oral argument what facts they would add to an amended complaint, plaintiffs were unable to provide any specific examples. The Court will issue an opinion setting forth the reasons for this ruling by no later than March 18, 2022. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/3/2022) (kv)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/17/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/17/2022 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Picciano Franko, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/23/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/31/2022..(Moya, Goretti)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #39 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(1). . Document filed by Stephen Edwards, Walid Fakhry, Soho Square Capital LLP..(New, Jonathan)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #47 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. . Document filed by Alexander Schmid. (Attachments: #1 Seiden Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C).(Seiden, Mark)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Document filed by Alexander Schmid. Responses due by 3/14/2022.(Seiden, Mark)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #37 MOTION to Dismiss . the Complaint. Document filed by ESO Capital Partners UK LLP. (Attachments: #1 Seiden Reply Declaration, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D).(Seiden, Mark)
February 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Alexander Schmid served on 1/28/2022, answer due 2/18/2022. Service was accepted by Anastasia Pommier. Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC; Snowbridge Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit).(Rasey, Randall)
February 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #39 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(1)., #37 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC..(Rasey, Randall)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 DECLARATION of Randall L Rasey in Opposition re: #39 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(1)., #37 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F - Emails).(Rasey, Randall)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 DECLARATION of Mark Schroeder in Opposition re: #39 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(1)., #37 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - NJ Status Report, #2 Exhibit B - BrokerCheck Report, #3 Exhibit C - DE Status Report, #4 Exhibit D - DE Merger Cert, #5 Exhibit E - NJ Merger Cert).(Rasey, Randall)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT #44) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #39 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(1)., #37 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC..(Rasey, Randall) Modified on 2/22/2022 (lb).
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 2/17/2022. The Court grants leave for counsel for defendant Alexander Schmid to file their motion to dismiss on the following briefing schedule: moving papers to be filed by Monday, February 28, 2022; opposing papers to be filed by Monday, March 14, 2022; and reply papers to be filed by Monday, March 21, 2022. The Court will inform the parties as to whether or not oral argument will be scheduled. (Kotowski, Linda)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Oral Argument held on 2/17/2022 re: #39 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(1). filed by Soho Square Capital LLP, Walid Fakhry, Stephen Edwards, #37 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by ESO Capital Partners UK LLP, #26 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. filed by Soho Square Capital LLP, Walid Fakhry, Stephen Edwards. (Kotowski, Linda)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #39 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(1). . Document filed by Stephen Edwards, Walid Fakhry, Soho Square Capital LLP..(New, Jonathan)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(1). Document filed by Stephen Edwards, Walid Fakhry, Soho Square Capital LLP..(New, Jonathan)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 2/1/2022, (Telephonic Oral Argument set for 2/17/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.)The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. The Court also grants the request of Soho Square, Mr. Fakhry, and Mr. Edwards to file a 12(b)(1) motion to dismiss, with briefing schedule set as follows: moving papers to be filed by February 4, 2022; response papers by February 18, 2022; and reply papers by March 1, 2022. (Kotowski, Linda)
January 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #37 MOTION to Dismiss . the Complaint. Document filed by ESO Capital Partners UK LLP. (Attachments: #1 Seiden Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B).(Seiden, Mark)
January 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by ESO Capital Partners UK LLP. Responses due by 2/18/2022.(Seiden, Mark)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 1/27/2022. The briefing schedule for ESO Capitals motion to dismiss is set as follows: moving papers filed by February 1, 2022; response papers filed by February 18, 2022; and reply papers filed by March 1, 2022. (Kotowski, Linda)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #26 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. . Document filed by Stephen Edwards, Walid Fakhry, Soho Square Capital LLP..(New, Jonathan)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 DECLARATION of Randall L Rasey in Opposition re: #26 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H_ESO Partners Report, #2 Exhibit I_ESO Capital UK Ltd Report, #3 Exhibit J_Soho Square Cap LLP Report, #4 Exhibit K_Soho Square Serv LLP Report, #5 Exhibit L_Soho Square Cap Press Release, #6 Exhibit M_Article, #7 Exhibit N_Article, #8 Exhibit O_Article, #9 Exhibit P_Article, #10 Exhibit Q_Companies House Report, #11 Exhibit R_Article).(Rasey, Randall)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DECLARATION of Mark Schroeder in Opposition re: #26 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_SB Securities LLC Operating Agr, #2 Exhibit B_SB Holdings LLC Operating Agr, #3 Exhibit C_SB Advisors LLC Operating Agr, #4 Exhibit D_Separation Agreements, #5 Exhibit E_Joinder Agreement, #6 Exhibit F_AML-KYC Documents).(Rasey, Randall)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #26 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Corrected Exhibit F to Declaration of Mark Schroeder. Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC..(Rasey, Randall) Modified on 1/18/2022 (lb).
January 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - AFFIRMATION of Randall L Rasey in Opposition re: #26 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H - ESO Partners Report, #2 Exhibit I - ESO Capital UK Report, #3 Exhibit J - Soho Square Capital Report, #4 Exhibit K - Soho Square Services Report, #5 Exhibit L - Sohos Square Press Release, #6 Exhibit M - Article, #7 Exhibit N - Article, #8 Exhibit O - Article, #9 Exhibit P - Article, #10 Exhibit Q - Article, #11 Exhibit R - Article).(Rasey, Randall) Modified on 1/18/2022 (lb).
January 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - AFFIDAVIT of Mark Schroeder in Opposition re: #26 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AML-KYC Docs).(Rasey, Randall) Modified on 1/18/2022 (lb).
January 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (MISSING AN EXHIBIT)- DECLARATION of Mark Schroeder in Opposition re: #26 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SB Securities Op Agr, #2 Exhibit B - SB Holdings Op Agr, #3 Exhibit C - SB Advisors Op Agr, #4 Exhibit D - Separation Agr, #5 Exhibit E - Joinder Agr).(Rasey, Randall) Modified on 1/18/2022 (lb).
January 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #26 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. . Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC..(Rasey, Randall)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 1/11/2022. The Court grants plaintiffs request to file under seal an exhibit to their opposition to the motion to dismiss. (Kotowski, Linda)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DECLARATION of Jonathan B. New in Support re: #26 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Stephen Edwards, Walid Fakhry, Soho Square Capital LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Decision from the UK House of Lords, #2 Exhibit 2 - Chapter from Chitty on Contracts, #3 Exhibit 3 - Chapter from Butterworths Corporate Law Service, #4 Exhibit 4 - Section from Sale of Shares and Businesses: Law, Practice and Agreements, #5 Exhibit 5 - Decision from High Court of Justice, Chancery Division, #6 Exhibit 6 - Decision from Hight Court of Justice, Chancery Division, #7 Exhibit 7 - Decision from the Court of Appeal of England and Wales, #8 Exhibit 8 - Decision from the High Court of Justice, Queens Bench Division).(New, Jonathan)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #26 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. . Document filed by Stephen Edwards, Walid Fakhry, Soho Square Capital LLP..(New, Jonathan)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Document filed by Stephen Edwards, Walid Fakhry, Soho Square Capital LLP..(New, Jonathan)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Soho Square Capital LLP..(New, Jonathan)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: (The telephonic argument on the motion to dismiss previously scheduled for January 28, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. is hereby rescheduled for 2/2/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.)The public may listen by dialing USA Toll-Free Number: (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415).. (Kotowski, Linda)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 12/3/2021, ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/10/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff in courtroom 14B of 500 Pearl Sreet. Oral Argument set for 1/28/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Madison Gaudreau on behalf of Stephen Edwards, Walid Fakhry, Soho Square Capital LLP..(Gaudreau, Madison)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Rose on behalf of Stephen Edwards, Walid Fakhry, Soho Square Capital LLP..(Rose, Nicholas)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Brian New on behalf of Stephen Edwards, Walid Fakhry, Soho Square Capital LLP..(New, Jonathan)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Soho Square Capital LLP waiver sent on 11/4/2021, answer due 2/2/2022. Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC; Snowbridge Securities LLC..(Rasey, Randall)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Stephen Edwards waiver sent on 11/4/2021, answer due 2/2/2022. Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC; Snowbridge Securities LLC..(Rasey, Randall)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Walid Fakhry waiver sent on 11/4/2021, answer due 2/2/2022. Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC; Snowbridge Securities LLC..(Rasey, Randall)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 11/16/2021, ( Initial Conference set for 12/3/2021 at 11:15 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff on the Courts AT&T line. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. (Kotowski, Linda)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. ESO Capital Partners UK LLP waiver sent on 11/4/2021, answer due 2/2/2022. Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC; Snowbridge Securities LLC..(Rasey, Randall)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Allison Lindsay Waks on behalf of ESO Capital Partners UK LLP..(Waks, Allison)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark R. Seiden on behalf of ESO Capital Partners UK LLP..(Seiden, Mark)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 11-19-2021, ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE AT 11:15 am. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. Initial Conference set for 11/19/2021 at 11:15 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/5/2021) (kv)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stephen Edwards..(pc)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ESO Capital Partners UK LLP..(pc)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Soho Square Capital LLP..(pc)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Walid Fakhry..(pc)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alexander Schmid..(pc)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Roger E. Barton on behalf of Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC..(Barton, Roger)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Randall L Rasey. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:294; Dollar Demand $3,000,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank;. (pc)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ESO Capital Partners UK LLP, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC..(Rasey, Randall)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Soho Square Capital LLP, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC..(Rasey, Randall)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Walid Fakhry, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC..(Rasey, Randall)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stephen Edwards, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC..(Rasey, Randall)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alexander Schmid, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC..(Rasey, Randall)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rasey, Randall)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Snowbridge Holdings LLC for Snowbridge Securities LLC. Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC..(Rasey, Randall)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ESO Capital Partners UK LLP, Stephen Edwards, Walid Fakhry, Alexander Schmid, Soho Square Capital LLP. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25286090)Document filed by Snowbridge Advisors LLC, Snowbridge Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Contract).(Rasey, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snowbridge Advisors LLC et al v. ESO Capital Partners UK LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soho Square Capital LLP
Represented By: Jonathan Brian New
Represented By: Madison Gaudreau
Represented By: Nicholas Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESO Capital Partners UK LLP
Represented By: Mark R. Seiden
Represented By: Allison Lindsay Waks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESO Capital Advisors LLP
Represented By: Jonathan Brian New
Represented By: Madison Gaudreau
Represented By: Nicholas Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core Capital Partners LLP
Represented By: Jonathan Brian New
Represented By: Madison Gaudreau
Represented By: Nicholas Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Schmid
Represented By: Mark R. Seiden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walid Fakhry
Represented By: Jonathan Brian New
Represented By: Madison Gaudreau
Represented By: Nicholas Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Edwards
Represented By: Jonathan Brian New
Represented By: Madison Gaudreau
Represented By: Nicholas Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Snowbridge Advisors LLC
Represented By: Randall L Rasey
Represented By: Roger E. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Snowbridge Securities LLC
Represented By: Randall L Rasey
Represented By: Roger E. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?