Civil Rights Corps. et al v. Pestana et al
Plaintiff: Civil Rights Corps., Cynthia Godsoe, Nicole Smith Futrell, Daniel S. Medwed, Justin Murray, Abbe Smith and Steven Zeidman
Defendant: Georgia Pestana, Melinda Katz, Andrea E. Bonina, Diana Maxfield Kearse and Hector D. LaSalle
Case Number: 1:2021cv09128
Filed: November 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2021 Filing 39 LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Gregory L. Diskant dated December 30, 2021 re: copying the Court in response to City Defendants' December 20, 2021 letter. Document filed by Civil Rights Corps., Cynthia Godsoe, Daniel S. Medwed, Justin Murray, Abbe Smith, Nicole Smith Futrell, Steven Zeidman..(Diskant, Gregory)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Request Granted. Plaintiffs shall have until December 31, 2021 to respond. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/22/2021) (js)
December 21, 2021 Filing 37 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Gregory L. Diskant dated December 21, 2021. Document filed by Civil Rights Corps., Cynthia Godsoe, Daniel S. Medwed, Justin Murray, Abbe Smith, Nicole Smith Futrell, Steven Zeidman..(Diskant, Gregory)
December 20, 2021 Filing 36 LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Krista Friedrich dated December 20, 2021 re: response to Plaintiffs' letter proposing motion for partial summary judgment (Dkt. No. 29). Document filed by Melinda Katz(In her official capacity the District Attorney of Queens County), Melinda Katz (Personal Capacity), Georgia Pestana(In her official capacity Corporation Counsel of the City of New York), Georgia Pestana(Personal Capacity)..(Friedrich, Krista)
December 20, 2021 Filing 35 LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Krista Friedrich dated December 20, 2021 re: copying the Court on City Defendants' letter to Plaintiffs' counsel re: proposed motion to dismiss. Document filed by Melinda Katz(In her official capacity the District Attorney of Queens County), Melinda Katz (Personal Capacity), Georgia Pestana(In her official capacity Corporation Counsel of the City of New York), Georgia Pestana(Personal Capacity)..(Friedrich, Krista)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #33 Letter, filed by Georgia Pestana, Melinda Katz. ENDORSEMENT: At this time the request by both parties, see also Dkt. 31, for a conference on January 18, 2022 is denied. The Court shall review all pre-motion letters and letters in opposition and will schedule a conference if deemed necessary after review. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/15/2021) (js)
December 14, 2021 Filing 33 LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Krista Friedrich dated December 14, 2021 re: Response to Plaintiffs' letter (Dkt. No. 31). Document filed by Melinda Katz(In her official capacity the District Attorney of Queens County), Melinda Katz (Personal Capacity), Georgia Pestana(In her official capacity Corporation Counsel of the City of New York), Georgia Pestana(Personal Capacity)..(Friedrich, Krista)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re: #30 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The City Defendants' request for an extension of time to answer the Complaint and respond to the request for unsealing is granted. City Defendants shall have until January 14, 2022 to respond to the complaint and the unsealing motion. City Defendants' request for an extension of time to respond to the pre- motion conference letter is denied. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/14/2021) (js)
December 14, 2021 Filing 31 LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Gregory L. Diskant dated December 14, 2021 re: Response to the City Defendants' Letter (dkt. no. 30). Document filed by Civil Rights Corps., Cynthia Godsoe, Daniel S. Medwed, Justin Murray, Abbe Smith, Nicole Smith Futrell, Steven Zeidman..(Diskant, Gregory)
December 14, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Melinda Katz(In her official capacity the District Attorney of Queens County) answer due 1/14/2022; Melinda Katz (Personal Capacity) answer due 1/14/2022; Georgia Pestana(In her official capacity Corporation Counsel of the City of New York) answer due 1/14/2022; Georgia Pestana(Personal Capacity) answer due 1/14/2022. Responses due by 1/14/2022 (js)
December 13, 2021 Filing 30 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Complaint and unsealing request, and First request for extension of time to respond to Plaintiffs' pre-motion conference letter addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Krista Friedrich dated December 13, 2021. Document filed by Melinda Katz(In her official capacity the District Attorney of Queens County), Melinda Katz (Personal Capacity), Georgia Pestana(In her official capacity Corporation Counsel of the City of New York), Georgia Pestana(Personal Capacity)..(Friedrich, Krista)
December 10, 2021 Filing 29 LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Gregory L. Diskant dated December 10, 2021 re: requesting a pre-motion conference. Document filed by Civil Rights Corps., Cynthia Godsoe, Daniel S. Medwed, Justin Murray, Abbe Smith, Nicole Smith Futrell, Steven Zeidman..(Diskant, Gregory)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: granting #26 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Request GRANTED. The State Defendants shall have until January 14, 2022 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint and to respond to the unsealing motion. This shall be the final extension. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/10/2021) (ama)
December 10, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Andrea E. Bonina(In her official capacity Chair of State of New York Greivance Committee for the Second, Eleventh and Thirteenth Judicial Districts) answer due 1/14/2022; Andrea E. Bonina (Personal Capacity) answer due 1/14/2022; Hector D. LaSalle answer due 1/14/2022; Diana Maxfield Kearse(Personal Capacity) answer due 1/14/2022. Responses due by 1/14/2022 (ama)
December 9, 2021 Filing 27 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Jeffrey F. Kinkle dated December 9, 2021 re: #26 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint and Motion to Unseal addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Elizabeth A. Figueira dated December 9, 2021. . Document filed by Civil Rights Corps., Cynthia Godsoe, Daniel S. Medwed, Justin Murray, Nicole Smith Futrell, Steven Zeidman..(Kinkle, Jeffrey)
December 9, 2021 Filing 26 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint and Motion to Unseal addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Elizabeth A. Figueira dated December 9, 2021. Document filed by Andrea E. Bonina(In her official capacity Chair of State of New York Greivance Committee for the Second, Eleventh and Thirteenth Judicial Districts), Hector D. LaSalle, Diana Maxfield Kearse(Personal Capacity)..(Figueira, Elizabeth)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Request Granted. the requested defendants shall have until December 17, 2021 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint and to respond to Plaintiffs' unsealing request. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/24/2021) (js)
November 23, 2021 Filing 24 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Krista Friedrich dated November 23, 2021. Document filed by Melinda Katz(In her official capacity the District Attorney of Queens County), Melinda Katz (Personal Capacity), Georgia Pestana(In her official capacity Corporation Counsel of the City of New York), Georgia Pestana(Personal Capacity)..(Friedrich, Krista)
November 23, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Krista Ann Friedrich on behalf of Melinda Katz(In her official capacity the District Attorney of Queens County), Melinda Katz (Personal Capacity), Georgia Pestana(In her official capacity Corporation Counsel of the City of New York), Georgia Pestana(Personal Capacity)..(Friedrich, Krista)
November 15, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Georgia Pestana(In her official capacity Corporation Counsel of the City of New York) served on 11/9/2021, answer due 11/30/2021; Georgia Pestana(Personal Capacity) served on 11/9/2021, answer due 11/30/2021. Document filed by Abbe Smith; Daniel S. Medwed ; Civil Rights Corps.; Steven Zeidman; Cynthia Godsoe; Justin Murray; Nicole Smith Futrell..(Diskant, Gregory)
November 12, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Hector D. LaSalle served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/17/2021. Document filed by Abbe Smith; Daniel S. Medwed ; Civil Rights Corps.; Steven Zeidman; Cynthia Godsoe; Justin Murray; Nicole Smith Futrell..(Diskant, Gregory)
November 12, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Diana Maxfield Kearse(Personal Capacity) served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/17/2021; Diana Maxfield Kearse(In her official capacity Cheif Counsel of the State of New York Greivance Committee for the Second, Eleventh and Thirteenth Judicial District) served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/17/2021. Document filed by Abbe Smith; Daniel S. Medwed ; Civil Rights Corps.; Steven Zeidman; Cynthia Godsoe; Justin Murray; Nicole Smith Futrell..(Diskant, Gregory)
November 12, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Melinda Katz(In her official capacity the District Attorney of Queens County) served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/1/2021; Melinda Katz (Personal Capacity) served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/1/2021. Document filed by Abbe Smith; Daniel S. Medwed ; Civil Rights Corps.; Steven Zeidman; Cynthia Godsoe; Justin Murray; Nicole Smith Futrell..(Diskant, Gregory)
November 12, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Andrea E. Bonina(In her official capacity Chair of State of New York Greivance Committee for the Second, Eleventh and Thirteenth Judicial Districts) served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/17/2021. Document filed by Abbe Smith; Daniel S. Medwed ; Civil Rights Corps.; Steven Zeidman; Cynthia Godsoe; Justin Murray; Nicole Smith Futrell..(Diskant, Gregory)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #15 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Endorsed Letter,,, addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Elizabeth A. Figueira dated November 10, 2021.FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Elizabeth A. Figueira dated November 10, 2021. ( Responses due by 12/17/2021); granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time It is hereby ORDERED that the request of the State Defendants is GRANTED. The State Defendants shall answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by December 17. The State Defendants shall also respond to the Courts November 9 Order by December 17. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/12/2021) (js)
November 12, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Andrea E. Bonina(In her official capacity Chair of State of New York Greivance Committee for the Second, Eleventh and Thirteenth Judicial Districts) answer due 12/17/2021; Andrea E. Bonina (Personal Capacity) answer due 12/17/2021; Hector D. LaSalle answer due 12/17/2021; Diana Maxfield Kearse(Personal Capacity) answer due 12/17/2021; Diana Maxfield Kearse(In her official capacity Cheif Counsel of the State of New York Greivance Committee for the Second, Eleventh and Thirteenth Judicial District) answer due 12/17/2021. (js)
November 11, 2021 Filing 16 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Gregory Diskant dated November 11, 2021 re: #15 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Endorsed Letter,,, addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Elizabeth A. Figueira dated November 10, 2021.FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Elizabeth A. Figueira dated November 10, 2021. Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendants' request for extension of time to respond to motion to unseal exhibits to complaint. Document filed by Civil Rights Corps., Cynthia Godsoe, Daniel S. Medwed, Justin Murray, Abbe Smith, Nicole Smith Futrell, Steven Zeidman..(Diskant, Gregory)
November 10, 2021 Filing 15 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Endorsed Letter,,, addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Elizabeth A. Figueira dated November 10, 2021., FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Elizabeth A. Figueira dated November 10, 2021. Document filed by Andrea E. Bonina(In her official capacity Chair of State of New York Greivance Committee for the Second, Eleventh and Thirteenth Judicial Districts), Hector D. LaSalle, Diana Maxfield Kearse(In her official capacity Cheif Counsel of the State of New York Greivance Committee for the Second, Eleventh and Thirteenth Judicial District)..(Figueira, Elizabeth)
November 9, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Melinda Katz.(vf)
November 9, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hector D. LaSalle. (vf)
November 9, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Georgia Pestana. (vf)
November 9, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Diana Maxfield Kearse. (vf)
November 9, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrea E. Bonina. (vf)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Gregory L. Diskant dated 11/8/2021 re: Counsel asks the Court to treat this letter-brief as a motion and to rule on this basis. The exhibits are judicial records and should be public for that reason alone. They do not fall within the ambit of Judiciary Law 90(10), and so there is no reason to keep them secret. And in any event, they cannot be kept secret consistent with the freedom accorded speech about matters of public importance under the First Amendment. For these reasons, the Court should unseal the documents filed by Plaintiffs under seal with their Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants are directed to respond within three days of service, by letter not to exceed three pages, to the matter set forth above by Plaintiffs. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/9/2021) (js)
November 4, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Melinda Katz, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Civil Rights Corps., Cynthia Godsoe, Daniel S. Medwed, Justin Murray, Abbe Smith, Nicole Smith Futrell, Steven Zeidman..(Diskant, Gregory)
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hector D. LaSalle, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Civil Rights Corps., Cynthia Godsoe, Daniel S. Medwed, Justin Murray, Abbe Smith, Nicole Smith Futrell, Steven Zeidman..(Diskant, Gregory)
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Georgia Pestana, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Civil Rights Corps., Cynthia Godsoe, Daniel S. Medwed, Justin Murray, Abbe Smith, Nicole Smith Futrell, Steven Zeidman..(Diskant, Gregory)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Diana Maxfield Kearse, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Civil Rights Corps., Cynthia Godsoe, Daniel S. Medwed, Justin Murray, Abbe Smith, Nicole Smith Futrell, Steven Zeidman..(Diskant, Gregory)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nmo)
November 4, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrea E. Bonina, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Civil Rights Corps., Cynthia Godsoe, Daniel S. Medwed, Justin Murray, Abbe Smith, Nicole Smith Futrell, Steven Zeidman..(Diskant, Gregory)
November 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(gp)
November 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrea E. Bonina(In her official capacity Chair of State of New York Greivance Committee for the Second, Eleventh and Thirteenth Judicial Districts), Andrea E. Bonina (Personal Capacity), Melinda Katz(In her official capacity the District Attorney of Queens County), Melinda Katz (Personal Capacity), Hector D. LaSalle, Diana Maxfield Kearse(Personal Capacity), Diana Maxfield Kearse(In her official capacity Cheif Counsel of the State of New York Greivance Committee for the Second, Eleventh and Thirteenth Judicial District), Georgia Pestana(In her official capacity Corporation Counsel of the City of New York), Georgia Pestana(Personal Capacity). (Filing Fee $ $402.00, Receipt Number 465401288653)Document filed by Abbe Smith, Daniel S. Medwed, Civil Rights Corps., Steven Zeidman, Cynthia Godsoe, Justin Murray, Nicole Smith Futrell. (Attachments: #1 Exh 1, #2 Exh 2, #3 Exh 3, #4 Exh 4, #5 Exh 5, #6 Exh 6, #7 Exh 7).(gp)
November 4, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REDACTING PLEADING FILED IN 21-mc-792 (LGS)...(gp)
November 4, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Civil Rights Corps. et al v. Pestana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Civil Rights Corps.
Represented By: Gregory L. Diskant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Godsoe
Represented By: Gregory L. Diskant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Smith Futrell
Represented By: Gregory L. Diskant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel S. Medwed
Represented By: Gregory L. Diskant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Murray
Represented By: Gregory L. Diskant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abbe Smith
Represented By: Gregory L. Diskant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Zeidman
Represented By: Gregory L. Diskant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pestana
Represented By: Krista Ann Friedrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Katz
Represented By: Krista Ann Friedrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea E. Bonina
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Figueira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Maxfield Kearse
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Figueira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector D. LaSalle
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Figueira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?