Hemmings v. JetBlue Airways Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Odette Hemmings
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation, Port Authority of New York and New Jersey and The Port Authority of New York & New Jersey
Case Number: 1:2021cv09130
Filed: November 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Referring Judge: Barbara C Moses
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 40105
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: It appearing to the Court that no initial case management conference has yet taken place in this action, it is hereby ORDERED that an initial conference in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P.16 will be held on January 19, 2022, at 11:00 a.m., in Courtroom 20A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. At the conference, the parties must be prepared to discuss the subjects set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and (c) and further set forth in this Order. Initial Conference set for 1/19/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 12/9/2021) (rro)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 12/6/2021) (ate)
November 30, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York & New Jersey..(Alimonti, Frederick)
November 30, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation..(Alimonti, Frederick)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties herein, that the time within which Defendants JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION and the PORT AUTHORITY OF NEW YORK AND NEW JERSEY must respond to the Complaint herein is extended up to and including November 30, 2021. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/23/2021) (ate)
November 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Howard Bruce Stolzenberg on behalf of Odette Hemmings..(Stolzenberg, Howard)
November 22, 2021 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Odette Hemmings.(Cortelli, Terrence)
November 10, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation, The Port Authority of New York & New Jersey..(Alimonti, Frederick)
November 5, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 5, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 5, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 5, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Frederick Alimonti. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The Port Authority of New York & New Jersey, JetBlue Airways Corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (vf)
November 5, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Frederick Alimonti. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code v (Voluntary); County code Bronx; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf)
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 SECOND RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Port Authority of New York and New Jersey..(Alimonti, Frederick)
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 SECOND RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation..(Alimonti, Frederick)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Alimonti, Frederick)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Port Authority of New York and New Jersey..(Alimonti, Frederick)
November 4, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation..(Alimonti, Frederick)
November 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 813782/2021E..Document filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation, Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit summons and Complaint from State C/A).(Alimonti, Frederick)
November 4, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 813782/2021E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25289898).Document filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation, Port Authority of New York and New Jersey..(Alimonti, Frederick) Modified on 11/5/2021 (vf). Modified on 11/5/2021 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hemmings v. JetBlue Airways Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odette Hemmings
Represented By: Howard Bruce Stolzenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Represented By: Frederick Alimonti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Port Authority of New York and New Jersey
Represented By: Frederick Alimonti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Port Authority of New York & New Jersey
Represented By: Frederick Alimonti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?