Doni v. Unite USA Inc.
Plaintiff: Eshed Doni
Defendant: Unite USA Inc. doing business as Unite Us
Case Number: 1:2021cv09133
Filed: November 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , move, or otherwise respond to the complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Gavin M. Masuda dated November 19, 2021. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 9. SO ORDERED. Unite USA Inc. answer due 1/7/2022 (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/22/2021) (jca)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Gavin M. Masuda to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
November 22, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Gavin M. Masuda to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25362093. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , move, or otherwise respond to the complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Gavin M. Masuda dated November 19, 2021. Document filed by Unite USA Inc...(Masuda, Gavin)
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Gavin M. Masuda to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25362093. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Unite USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Masuda, Gavin)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Unite USA Inc...(Galanakis, Theodore)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Theodore M. Galanakis on behalf of Unite USA Inc...(Galanakis, Theodore)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on February 15, 2022 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. All counsel are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF and to familiarize themselves with the SDNY ECF Rules & Instructions, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. Additionally, in accordance with Paragraph 2.D of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than Thursday of the week prior to the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED.( Initial Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/5/21) (yv) Modified on 11/17/2021 (yv).
November 5, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Unite USA Inc.. (vf)
November 5, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 5, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 5, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 4, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Unite USA Inc. d/b/a Unite Us, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Eshed Doni..(Silver, Gerald)
November 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Silver, Gerald)
November 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unite USA Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25290263)Document filed by Eshed Doni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6).(Silver, Gerald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doni v. Unite USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eshed Doni
Represented By: Gerald D. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unite USA Inc. doing business as Unite Us
Represented By: Gavin Masuda
Represented By: Theodore M. Galanakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?