Jones v. Doe
Plaintiff: Rafael Arden Jones, Sr.
Defendant: Police Officer "Jane" Doe
Case Number: 1:2021cv09199
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 17 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: #16 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint). (sjo)
November 18, 2021 Mailed a copy of #15 Order of Dismissal, #16 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), to Rafael Arden Jones, Sr., NYSID: 12819779Y, B&C: 2412101760 at Vernon C. Bain Center, 1 Halleck Street, 3CB Cell 22 Upper, Bronx, NY 10474. (Attachments: # 1 Pro Se Appeal Package) (dsh)
November 18, 2021 Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Processed: Mailed copy of 2241/2254 Petitions, IFP Forms to Rafael Arden Jones, Sr., NYSID: 12819779Y, B&C: 2412101760 at Vernon C. Bain Center, 1 Halleck Street, 3CB Cell 22 Upper, Bronx, NY 10474 on 11/18/2021. (sha)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CIVIL JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed without prejudice under the Prison Litigation Reform Act's "three-strikes" rule. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Plaintiff continues to be barred from filing any civil action under the in forma pauperis ("IFP") statute while a prisoner unless Plaintiff is under imminent danger of serious physical injury. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/16/2021) (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Appeal Package) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915(g): The Court denies Plaintiff's request to proceed IFP, and the complaint is dismissed without prejudice under the PLRA's "three-strikes" rule. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Plaintiff remains barred from filing any future civil action IFP while he is in custody, unless he is under imminent threat of serious physical injury. The Court notes that Plaintiff is also barred, under 28 U.S.C. 1651, from filing any new action IFP without first obtaining from the court leave to file. See Jones v. Stewart, ECF 1:16-CV-2375, 9 (S.D.N.Y. Aug. 25, 2016). The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all motions in this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/16/2021) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 16, 2021 Filing 14 PLAINTIFF'S PETITION CITING POLITICAL CORRUPTION REQUESTING THE AUTHORIZATION OF MILITARY FORCE 50 USCS 1541. JUSTICE AGAINST SPONSOR OF TERRORIST ACT 18 USCS 2333(1)(2) AIDING AND ABETTING BY BRONX CITY COUNCIL. Document filed by Rafael Arden Jones, Sr. (sac)
November 16, 2021 Filing 13 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR REDRESS UNDER THE NATIONAL LABORS RELATIONS ACT OF 29 USCS 160, 185 FED. R. CIV. P.81 A, 50 USC 1701 ET. SEQ. INTERNATIONAL EMERGENCY ECONOMIC POWERS. Document filed by Rafael Arden Jones, Sr. (sac)
November 16, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION re Amicus Curiae. Document filed by Rafael Arden Jones, Sr. (sac)
November 16, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER from Rafael Jones dated 11/10/2021 re: Can you please attach to newly transferred 2241 Petition all motions mailed in case number 21-cv-6035. My address is Vernon C. Bain Center. (Can you please forward me a copy of 2241/2254 Petition and IFP Forms.) Document filed by Rafael Arden Jones, Sr. (sac)
November 16, 2021 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #11 Letter, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sac)
November 9, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
November 8, 2021 Filing 10 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New York Eastern; Case Number: 1:21-cv-06035. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
November 5, 2021 Case electronically transferred to the Southern District of New York. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Gonzalez, Fida) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/8/2021.]
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: The Clerk of Court is hereby directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. See 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The decisions on Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, request for pro bono counsel, and enforcement of the Prison Litigation Reform Act are reserved for the transferee Court. The Court offers no opinion on the merits of the action. The provision of Local Rule 83.1 that requires a seven-day stay is hereby waived. Summonses shall not issue from this Court and the Clerk of Court is directed to mark this case closed. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 11/4/2021. (Stephan, Keegan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/8/2021.]
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement #1 Complaint by Rafael Arden Jones, Sr. (Almonte, Giselle) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/8/2021.]
November 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of updated information, filed by Rafael Jones. (Attachments: #1 Change of Venue, #2 Providing for victims of domestic terrorism) (Almonte, Giselle) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/8/2021.]
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address: Rafael Arden Jones, Sr. 2412101760 Vernon C. Bain Center (VCBC) 1 Halleck Street Bronx, NY 10474. (Almonte, Giselle) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/8/2021.]
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/8/2021.]
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 Prisoner Authorization (Neptune, Pierre) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/8/2021.]
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Rafael Arden Jones, Sr. (Neptune, Pierre) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/8/2021.]
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rafael Arden Jones, Sr. (Neptune, Pierre) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/8/2021.]
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jane Doe Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Rafael Arden Jones, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Neptune, Pierre) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/8/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Arden Jones, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer "Jane" Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?