Mullikin et al v. The City Of New York et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Mullikin and Mikaela A. Duffy
Defendant: The City Of New York,, NYC Police Commissioner Dermot Shea, John Does "1" through "10" (NYPD Deputy Commissioners, Commanding Officers and Supervising Officers responsible for directing and supervising the NYPD's response to the George Floy, The City Of New York and John Does 1 Through 10
Case Number: 1:2021cv09200
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alain Vernauid Massena on behalf of Dennis Mullikin..(Massena, Alain)
January 5, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alain Vernauid Massena on behalf of Mikaela A. Duffy..(Massena, Alain)
January 5, 2022 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (wrong attorney/party association on PDF) (SEE #12 NOTICE) - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alain Vernauid Massena on behalf of Dennis Mullikin..(Massena, Alain) Modified on 1/5/2022 (db).
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion to Substitute Attorney. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 8. Attorney Andrew Galway Owen terminated. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/29/2021) (rro)
November 24, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Andrew Galway Owen, New Attorney: Daniel Michael Braun addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Document filed by NYC Police Commissioner Dermot Shea, The City Of New York..(Braun, Daniel)
November 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Andrew Galway Owen, New Attorney: Daniel Michael Braun, Address: New York City Law Department, 100 Church Street, Room 3-149, New York, NY, USA 10007, (212) 356-2659. Document filed by NYC Police Commissioner Dermot Shea, The City Of New York. (Attachments: #1 Declaration).(Braun, Daniel)
November 12, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 12, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 12, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 10, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Corrected notice of removal served on plaintiff on 11/10/21. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by NYC Police Commissioner Dermot Shea, The City Of New York..(Owen, Andrew)
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 158072/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25318241).Document filed by NYC Police Commissioner Dermot Shea, The City Of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and complaint).(Owen, Andrew)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) : Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, www.nysd.uscourts.gov, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information.(jpt)
November 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Andrew Galway Owen to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; PDF reflects another Filing Court title in the TO: section. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 11/15/2021. (vf)
November 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Andrew Galway Owen. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: John Does 1 Through 10. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
November 8, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of removal and civil cover sheet served on plaintiff on 11/8/21. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by NYC Police Commissioner Dermot Shea, The City Of New York,..(Owen, Andrew)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Owen, Andrew)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR -DEFICIENT PLEADING- PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 158072/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25302208).Document filed by NYC Police Commissioner Dermot Shea, The City Of New York,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and complaint).(Owen, Andrew) Modified on 11/9/2021 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullikin et al v. The City Of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Mullikin
Represented By: Alain Vernauid Massena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikaela A. Duffy
Represented By: Alain Vernauid Massena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City Of New York,
Represented By: Andrew Galway Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC Police Commissioner Dermot Shea
Represented By: Andrew Galway Owen
Represented By: Daniel Michael Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does "1" through "10" (NYPD Deputy Commissioners, Commanding Officers and Supervising Officers responsible for directing and supervising the NYPD's response to the George Floy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City Of New York
Represented By: Andrew Galway Owen
Represented By: Daniel Michael Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 Through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?